Felishia Ufarttee Jones
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00246 (alnb)

Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #13; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay. Hearing scheduled 02/21/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham

18-00246-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Felishia Ufarttee Jones } Case No: 18-00246-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-9568 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter came before the Court on Tuesday, February 13, 2018 10:00 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #13; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Brent William Davis, attorney for Felishia Ufarttee Jones (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, staff attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on the filings and arguments of counsel, the matter is continued to February 21, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (special setting) in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Dated: 02/13/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 18-00246-DSC13 Doc 22 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 10:46:34 Desc Main document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[22] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 18-00246-DSC Felishia Ufarttee Jones Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: admin Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 17 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db +Felishia Ufarttee Jones, PO Box 203, Calera, AL 35040-0203 9613358 ++AARON S INC, PO BOX 100039, KENNESAW GA 30156-9239 (address filed with court: Aaron Sales & Lease, 309 E Paces Ferry Rd Ne, Atlanta, GA 30305) 9613360 +Avadian Credit Union, 1 Riverchase Pkwy S, Hoover, AL 35244-2008 9614241 +CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, 25505 W 12 MILE RD SUITE 3000, SOUTHFIELD MI 48034-8331 9613363 Fst Premier, 601 S Minneapolis Ave, Sioux Falls, SD 57104 9613364 +Holloway Credit Solutions, Po Box 6441, Dothan, AL 36302-6441 9613357 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 9613368 +Us Dept Ed, Ecmc/Bankruptcy, Po Box 16408, St Paul, MN 55116-0408 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9629645 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Feb 13 2018 18:30:40 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, Alabama 36132-0001 9613359 +E-mail/Text: bsimmons@amsher.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:21 AmSher Collection Srv, 4524 Southlake Parkway, Suite 15, Hoover, AL 35244-3271 9613361 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy_notifications@ccsusa.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:53 Credit Collections Svc, Po Box 773, Needham, MA 02494-0918 9613362 +E-mail/PDF: creditonebknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:51 Credit One Bank Na, Po Box 98873, Las Vegas, NV 89193-8873 9613356 +E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Feb 13 2018 18:28:43 Internal Revenue Service TCS, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6432 9613365 E-mail/Text: JCAP_BNC_Notices@jcap.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:03 Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, 16 Mcleland Rd, Saint Cloud, MN 56303 9613366 +E-mail/PDF: pa_dc_claims@navient.com Feb 13 2018 18:27:49 Navient, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 9500, Wilkes-Barr, PA 18773-9500 9613367 E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:31 Portfolio Recovery, Po Box 41067, Norfolk, VA 23541 9613355 E-mail/Text: jennifer.chacon@spservicing.com Feb 13 2018 18:31:03 Select Portfolio Servicing, PO BOX 65250, Salt Lake City, UT 84165-0250 TOTAL: 9 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. ndbankruptcy@sirote.com TOTAL: 3 Case 18-00246-DSC13 Doc 23 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 18-00246-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Felishia Ufarttee Jones } Case No: 18-00246-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-9568 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter came before the Court on Tuesday, February 13, 2018 10:00 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #13; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Brent William Davis, attorney for Felishia Ufarttee Jones (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, staff attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on the filings and arguments of counsel, the matter is continued to February 21, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (special setting) in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Dated: 02/13/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 18-00246-DSC13 Doc 23 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/22/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Felishia Ufarttee Jones
2
01/22/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones.
3
01/22/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones
5
01/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones.
6
01/22/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones.
7
01/22/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones.
8
01/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/03/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/02/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/23/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/23/2018.
01/23/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones Case Number 07-01130, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/09/2007, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee on 08/04/2008; Case Number 09-04637, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/05/2009, Dismissed for Other Reason on 11/04/2010; Case Number 11-04419, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/02/2011, Dismissed for Other Reason on 11/18/2011; Case Number 01-09196, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/20/2001; Case Number 13-00884, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/28/2013, Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 03/27/2013; Case Number 12-05569, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/26/2012, Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 12/04/2012; Case Number 02-05869, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/26/2002, Standard Discharge on 11/16/2004; Case Number 17-02227, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/23/2017, Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/24/2017; Case Number 13-04374, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/01/2013, Dismissed for Abuse on 10/17/2013; Case Number 97-70125, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/13/1997; Case Number 11-06090, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/03/2011, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee on 01/06/2012; Case Number 12-01909, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/19/2012, Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 04/27/2012.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/23/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
01/23/2018
Order Denying Application for Payment of Filing Fees in Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor's Application to pay the filing fee in installments is hereby DENIED because filing fees from a prior case or cases are unpaid. All filing fees in the current case are due and payable. This case will be set for show cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to pay fees by separate notice of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (Non-Image Order) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones).
11
01/23/2018
Notes: Case number 13-00884-TOM13 filing fees in the amount of $281.00 was not paid and case number 13-04374-TOM7 filing fees in the amount of $306.00 was not paid. (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones).
12
01/23/2018
Notice to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Pay Filing Fee. Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/6/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
01/24/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00246-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21642455. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
01/24/2018
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones
14
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
15
01/25/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 13 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
16
01/25/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
17
01/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Felishia Ufarttee Jones). Notice Date 01/25/2018.
18
01/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/25/2018.
19
01/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice to Show Cause). Notice Date 01/25/2018.
20
01/26/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
21
01/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/27/2018.
22
02/13/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #13; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay. Hearing scheduled 02/21/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
23
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[22] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
37
06/08/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.