Felthauser v. Krieger
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00235 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
06/04/2018
Summary Judgment
58
06/04/2018
Declaration
59
06/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
60
06/05/2018
Declaration
61
06/18/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
62
06/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
06/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
06/29/2018
Witness List
65
06/29/2018
Witness List
66
07/03/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
67
07/10/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
68
07/12/2018
Notice (Other)
07/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
08/13/2018
Pretrial Order
08/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
08/14/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
08/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.