Ferris v. Afognak Native Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00150 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
413
05/23/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
414
06/04/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
415
06/21/2018
Order
416
06/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
417
06/27/2018
Additional Related Document
418
06/27/2018
Declaration
420
06/27/2018
Compel
421
06/27/2018
Declaration
422
06/27/2018
Additional Related Document
423
06/29/2018
Order on Motion to Seal
424
06/29/2018
Reconsideration
425
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
426
07/11/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
427
07/11/2018
Declaration
428
07/11/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
429
07/11/2018
Declaration
430
07/11/2018
Declaration
431
07/11/2018
Declaration
434
07/18/2018
Response in Support of Motion
435
07/18/2018
Declaration
437
07/18/2018
Response in Support of Motion
438
07/18/2018
Declaration
441
08/03/2018
In Chambers Conference
444
08/15/2018
Notice (Other)
445
08/15/2018
Reconsideration
446
08/17/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
447
08/20/2018
Notice (Other)
448
08/22/2018
Additional Related Document
449
08/22/2018
Declaration
451
08/22/2018
Declaration
452
08/22/2018
Declaration
453
08/23/2018
Witness List
454
08/23/2018
Witness List
455
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
456
08/27/2018
Notice (Other)
457
08/30/2018
Compel
458
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
459
08/30/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
460
08/30/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
461
08/31/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
462
08/31/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
463
08/31/2018
Certificate of Counsel
464
08/31/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
465
08/31/2018
Stipulation
466
08/31/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
467
08/31/2018
Notice (Other)
08/31/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
468
08/31/2018
Clerks Notice
474
09/12/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
09/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
476
10/01/2018
Stipulation
477
10/02/2018
Order on Stipulation
478
10/04/2018
Transcript
479
10/17/2018
Stipulation
480
10/17/2018
Order on Stipulation
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.