First Student, Inc. v. Teamsters, Local 959
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00305 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/26/2018
Complaint
2
12/26/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/26/2018
Vacate
4
12/26/2018
Memorandum
5
12/27/2018
Unissued Summons
12/27/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/28/2018
Affidavit of Service
7
01/08/2019
Corporate Disclosure Statement
8
01/15/2019
Appear
01/17/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
02/19/2019
Answer to Complaint
11
02/19/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
12
02/19/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
02/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
02/20/2019
Dismiss
15
02/20/2019
Dismiss
16
02/22/2019
Order
17
02/26/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
18
03/04/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
19
03/08/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
20
03/11/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
21
03/15/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/23/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
24
03/23/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
25
03/23/2019
Leave to File Document
26
03/23/2019
Additional Related Document
27
03/23/2019
Additional Related Document
28
03/25/2019
Errata
29
03/27/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
30
03/27/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
04/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
04/08/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
04/12/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/23/2019
Stay
35
04/24/2019
Order
04/30/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.