Four way Plant Farm, et al v. Ncci, et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:1994-cv-01324 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/14/1994
DEMAND for jury trial by Four Way Plant Farm, McDonald Const. Co., Walker Logging Co.
2
10/14/1994
Defendants' Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in Circuit Court of Bullock County, Al
10/14/1994
CASE REFERRED to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Granite State Ins.
4
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by St. Paul Ins. Co.
5
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by NCCI
6
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Ins. Co. N. America
7
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Casualty Co.
8
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Hanover Insurance Co (Attorney Deborah Alley Smith)
9
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Company, Hartford Ins. Co.
10
10/14/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Fidelity & Casualty
11
10/17/1994
Defendant Granite State Ins. Co. Joinder to Notice of Removal.
12
10/17/1994
Defendant The Travelers Ins. Co. Joinder to Notice of Removal.
13
10/17/1994
Defendants Hartford Accident and Indemnity Co. and Hartford Underwriters Ins. Co. Consent to and Joinder in the Notice of Removal
14
10/17/1994
Defendants NCCI, National Workers Compensation and Robert E. Maxwell, Jr. Consent of Removal
15
10/17/1994
Defendant Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. Joinder in Notice of Removal Action
16
10/17/1994
Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Ins. Co. Confirmation of Consent, Joinder and Authorization
10/18/1994
File referred to Judge Albritton. (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/18/1994
Defendant Employers Insurance of Wausau Consent to Removal; referred to Judge Albritton.
18
10/18/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Fidelity & Co.; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
10/18/1994
AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for defendant. (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/21/1994
MOTION by Liberty Mutual Ins. to Extend Time to file responsive pleading to complaint ; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
20
10/21/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Robert E. Maxwell Jr. (Attorney Walker Percy Badham III), referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
21
10/21/1994
Defendant Aetna Casualty and Surety Company's Confirmation of Consent, Joinder and Authorization of Notice of Removal; referred to Judge Albritton.
22
10/21/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Ins. Co.; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
23
10/21/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Employers Insurance (Attorney), referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
10/24/1994
Stamped ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleading to complaint (by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/24/1994
Defendant Employers Casualty Company's Notice of Receivership (w/attachment); referred to Judge Albritton. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
25
10/26/1994
MOTION by Ins. Co. N. America for Richard G. Parker and Jeffrey W. Kilduff to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 20.00 RECEIPT # 53534 (w/attachments); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
26
10/26/1994
MOTION by Four Way Plant Farm, McDonald Const. Co., Walker Logging Co. to Remand referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
27
10/26/1994
MOTION for Stanley B. Block to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Fidelity and Casualty Company of New York FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53544 (w/attachment); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
28
10/27/1994
MOTION for James R. Safley and Linda S. Foreman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants Employers Insurance of Wausau FILING FEE $ 20.00 RECEIPT # 53549 (w/attachments); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
29
10/27/1994
ORDER granting [25-1] motion for Richard G. Parker and Jeffrey W. Kilduff to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 20.00 RECEIPT # 53534 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
30
10/27/1994
ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Stanley B. Block to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Fidelity and Casualty Company of New York FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53544 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/1995
31
10/27/1994
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why plaintiffs' motion to remand should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 11/25/94 for Fictitious Defendant(s), for Robert E. Maxwell Jr., for Granite State Ins., for Hanover Insurance Co, for Hartford Ins. Co., for U.S. Fidelity & Co., for Travelers Ins. Co., for St. Paul Ins. Co., for Ins. Co. N. America, for Hartford Company, for Employers Insurance, for Employers Casualty, for Fidelity & Casualty, for Aetna Casualty Co., for Liberty Mutual Ins., for National Workers', for NCCI, set Brief deadline to 11/10/94 for plaintiffs [26-1] motion to Remand by Walker Logging Co., McDonald Const. Co., Four Way Plant Farm set for submission, without oral hearing, on 11/25/94 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/1995
32
10/27/1994
MOTION by U.S. Fidelity & Co. for Lewis A. Noonberg and David H. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 20 RECEIPT # 53562 (w/attachments), referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/1995
33
10/27/1994
MOTION by Aetna Casualty Co. for Mark Horning, Merritt Blakeslee, and Anthony J. LaRocca to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 30 RECEIPT # 53561 (w/attachments), referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/1995
34
10/28/1994
ORDER granting [28-1] motion for James R. Safley and Linda S. Foreman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants Employers Insurance of Wausau FILING FEE $ 20.00 RECEIPT # 53549 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/1995
35
10/28/1994
MOTION by Hartford Company, Hartford Ins. Co. for William M. Hannay, Andrew Porter, and Edward Wong, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (w/attachments), referred to Judge W. H. Albritton(dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/1995
36
10/31/1994
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Granite State Ins. : amends [3-1] answer by Granite State Ins.; referred to Judge Albritton. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
37
10/31/1994
MOTION for William H. Stanhope and Sheri L. Gates to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Employers Ins. of Wausau (w/attachments); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
38
10/31/1994
MOTION for James P. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Employers Casualty Company (w/attachments); FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53587 referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
39
10/31/1994
MOTION for Kevin J. Arquit, John A. Karaczynski, Guy C. Quinlin and Gary R. Carney, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants National Council on Compensation Ins., National Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Pool and Robert E. Maxwell, Jr. FILING FEE $ 40.00 RECEIPT # 53592 (w/attachments); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
40
10/31/1994
MOTION for Leon Goodrich and Bradley Clary to Appear Pro Hac Vice (w/attachments); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
11/01/1994
Filing Fee Paid for admission pro hac vice for William H. Stanhope and Sheri L. Gates; FILING FEE $ 20.00 RECEIPT # 53613 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/1994
Filing Fee Paid for admission pro hac vice for Leon Goodrich and Bradley G. Clary; FILING FEE $ 20.00 RECEIPT # 53615 (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/02/1994
ORDER granting [40 -1] motion for Leon Goodrich and Bradley Clary to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting [39 -1] motion for Kevin J. Arquit, John A. Karaczynski, Guy C. Quinlin and Gary R. Carney, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants National Council on Compensation Ins., National Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Pool and Robert E. Maxwell, Jr. FILING FEE $ 40.00 RECEIPT # 53592, granting [38-1] motion for James P. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Employers Casualty Company (w/attachments); FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53587, granting [37-1] motion for William H. Stanhope and Sheri L. Gates to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Employers Ins. of Wausau, granting [33-1] motion for Mark Horning, Merritt Blakeslee, and Anthony J. LaRocca to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 30 RECEIPT # 53561, granting [32-1] motion for Lewis A. Noonberg and David H. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 20 RECEIPT # 53562 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
42
11/02/1994
MOTION for Andrew C. Porter, William M. Hannay, III and Edward James Wong, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hartford Accident and Indemnity and Hartford Underwriters Ins. Co. w/attachments); FILING FEE $ 30.00 RECEIPT # 53622 referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
43
11/03/1994
ORDER granting [42-1] motion for Andrew C. Porter, William M. Hannay, III and Edward James Wong, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hartford Accident and Indemnity and Hartford Underwriters Ins. Co. w/attachments); FILING FEE $ 30.00 RECEIPT # 53622 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
44
11/07/1994
MOTION for Maureen M. McGuirl to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53681 (w/attachment); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
45
11/07/1994
MOTION for Leslye M. Fraser to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53681 (w/attachment) referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
46
11/08/1994
ORDER granting [45-1] motion for Leslye M. Fraser to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53681, granting [44-1] motion for Maureen M. McGuirl to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 53681 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
47
11/10/1994
BRIEF by Four Way Plant Farm, McDonald Const. Co., Walker Logging Co. in support of [26-1] motion to Remand referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/1995
48
11/18/1994
AGREED MOTION by Four Way Plant Farm, McDonald Const. Co., Walker Logging Co. to Dismiss Defendant Employers Casualty Company ; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
49
11/21/1994
ORDER granting [48-1] motion to Dismiss Defendant Employers Casualty Company; dismissing all claims against defendant Employers Casualty; that each party bear its own costs (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
50
11/22/1994
JOINT MOTION by Four Way Plant Farm, McDonald Const. Co., Walker Logging Co., NCCI, National Workers', Liberty Mutual Ins., Aetna Casualty Co., Fidelity & Casualty, Employers Insurance, Hartford Company, Ins. Co. N. America, St. Paul Ins. Co., Travelers Ins. Co., U.S. Fidelity & Co., Hartford Ins. Co., Hanover Insurance Co, Granite State Ins., Robert E. Maxwell Jr. to Extend Time for Briefing Schedule and Submission Deadline on Motion to Remand ; referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
51
11/23/1994
ORDER granting [50-1] joint motion to Extend Time for Briefing Schedule and Submission Deadline on Motion to Remand, [26-1] motion to Remand by Walker Logging Co., McDonald Const. Co., Four Way Plant Farm set for submission on 2/1/95, brief in support due by 1/16/95 for Walker Logging Co., for McDonald Const. Co., for Four Way Plant Farm, brief in opposition due by 2/1/94 for Robert E. Maxwell Jr., for Granite State Ins., for Hanover Insurance Co, for Hartford Ins. Co., for U.S. Fidelity & Co., for Travelers Ins. Co., for St. Paul Ins. Co., for Ins. Co. N. America, for Hartford Company, for Employers Insurance, for Fidelity & Casualty, for NCCI (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
52
01/17/1995
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by Four Way Plant Farm, McDonald Const. Co., Walker Logging Co. in support of [26-1] motion to Remand referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
53
01/17/1995
EVIDENTIARY MATERIALS by Four Way Plant Farm, McDonald Const. Co., Walker Logging Co. in support of [26-1] motion to Remand (Two Volumes maintained in two separate binders - Attachments 1-27c); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
54
02/01/1995
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF WILLIAM F. VIEWEG AND ROBERT E. MAXWELL, JR. by Ins. Co. N. America in opposition to [26-1] motion to Remand (Affidavits attached); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
55
02/01/1995
BRIEF by Ins. Co. N. America in opposition to [26-1] motion to Remand (w/Attachments 1-2); referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
56
02/01/1995
MOTION by National Workers' to Dismiss referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
57
02/01/1995
BRIEF by National Workers' in support of [56-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
58
07/25/1995
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Remand; remanding case to Circuit Court of Bullock County, AL; directing clerk to effect the remand (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel and certified copy to Clerk, Circuit Court of Bullock County, AL furnished to MT, EL (dmk) Modified on 07/26/1995
07/25/1995
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
11/05/2009
(WITHDRAWN PER 11/5/09 NOTICE OF CORRECTION) NOTICE of Disposal of Discovery Materials, Depositions and Trial Exhibits. Modified on 11/5/2009 to add docket text.
1
Notice to Return or Dispose of Trial Exhibits
1 Attachment
60
11/05/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 59 Notice of Disposal of Discovery Materials, Depositions and Trial Exhibits.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.