Francine Yvette Washington
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01611 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
42
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
02/07/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)
46
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.