Frank v. Conant
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00047 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
06/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
06/12/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
07/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
09/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
10/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
10/15/2018
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
32
10/23/2018
Hearing
33
10/23/2018
Affidavit
11/07/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Docket Annotation re 28:2254 Merit Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
11/09/2018
Notice (Other)
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Docket Annotation - Public Officer-Agency (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
11/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
38
11/16/2018
Response to Habeas Petition
39
12/07/2018
Supplement
40
01/15/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing
02/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
03/11/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
03/13/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
04/05/2019
Response to Order to Show Cause
46
04/05/2019
Merit Briefing re 28:2254 , Response
04/08/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
04/05/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
49
04/26/2019
Merit Briefing re 28:2254, Reply to Response

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.