Franulovich v. Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00012 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/14/2018
Complaint
2
08/14/2018
Jury Demand
3
08/21/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
4
08/21/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
08/21/2018
Docket Annotation re Duplicate Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/21/2018
Order
6
08/27/2018
Order
7
08/29/2018
Unissued Summons
08/29/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/12/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
09/19/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
11
09/24/2018
Answer to Complaint
12
10/03/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
13
10/08/2018
Notice (Other)
14
10/09/2018
Scheduling Order
15
11/16/2018
Witness List
16
11/16/2018
Statement
17
11/16/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
18
11/16/2018
Witness List
19
11/16/2018
Statement

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.