Frederick Frank Strojny, Jr and Julie Marie Strojny
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00371 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/27/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/27/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/28/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/29/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/29/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
10/30/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
10/30/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
11/01/2018
Request for Special Notice
15
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
16
11/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
11/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
11/13/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/13/2018
Certificate of Service
19
11/13/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
11/23/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
11/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
12/04/2018
Certificate of Service
22
12/07/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
23
12/07/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
24
12/07/2018
Certificate of Service
25
12/07/2018
Affidavit
12/07/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/11/2018
Affidavit
12/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
12/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.