Free v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00242 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
08/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
16
08/10/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
09/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/01/2018
Status Report
19
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/30/2018
Status Report
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/18/2019
Notice (Other)
03/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/05/2019
Status Report
03/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
04/15/2019
Notice (Other)
04/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
05/03/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
30
05/03/2019
Declaration
31
05/14/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
05/15/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
05/16/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.