Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges et al v. Zinke et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00029 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
05/23/2018
Leave to File Document
39
05/24/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
40
05/25/2018
Leave to File Document
41
05/31/2018
Notice (Other)
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
06/04/2018
Notice of Appearance
44
06/04/2018
Clerks Notice
06/04/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
06/15/2018
Notice (Other)
46
06/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
47
06/21/2018
Notice (Other)
48
06/21/2018
Additional Related Document
49
06/25/2018
Stipulation
50
07/11/2018
Summary Judgment
51
07/11/2018
Memorandum
52
07/11/2018
Declaration
53
07/11/2018
Declaration
54
07/11/2018
Declaration
55
07/11/2018
Declaration
56
07/11/2018
Declaration
57
07/11/2018
Declaration
58
07/11/2018
Declaration
59
07/11/2018
Declaration
60
07/11/2018
Declaration
61
07/11/2018
Declaration
62
07/11/2018
Declaration
63
07/11/2018
Declaration
64
07/11/2018
Declaration
65
08/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
66
08/24/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
08/28/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
08/24/2018
Leave to File Document
68
08/24/2018
Notice (Other)
70
08/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
71
09/04/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
72
09/04/2018
Strike
73
09/18/2018
Stipulation
09/18/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
09/20/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
76
09/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
77
10/04/2018
Order
10/16/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
10/17/2018
Order of Recusal
10/17/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
01/10/2019
Order on Motion to Strike
82
03/29/2019
ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The Motion for Summary Judgment at Docket 50 is GRANTED. The Exchange Agreement is SET ASIDE and VACATED. Plaintiffs' additional request for injunctive relief is DENIED. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/29/2019.
83
03/29/2019
Judgment
84
04/25/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
85
05/01/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
05/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.