Fun Time Boat Rental v. Gonzales, et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

3:2004-cv-02139 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 564 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/08/2004
COMPLAINT FILED for Limitation for Exoneration of Limitation of Liability
2
10/26/2004
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that Pla shall file an amended complaint in conformace w/Rule F, Supplemental Rules for certain Admirality and Maritime Claims, nlt 11/8/04 (cc: all counsel) re: order filed [2-1] (MAP) (ADI-ICMS,).
3
11/04/2004
MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Mark D. Holmes, atty for pla Fun Time Boat R&S [3-1]
4
11/09/2004
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Mark D. Holmes, atty for pla Fun Time Boat R&S [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (KMG) (ADI-ICMS,).
5
11/08/2004
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability by pla Fun Time Boat R&S [1-1]
11/09/2004
Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Mark D Holmes (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/09/2004
NOTICE OF FILING BOND in the amount of $ 31,781.00 with approved surety, International Fidelity Insurance Company, Bond No. 382642, filed by pla Fun Time Boat R&S
7
12/02/2004
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that the pla shall file with the Court a proposed Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability pursuant to Rule 4(F) of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims, together with the other information requried by the Court, no later than 12/20/04. (cc: all counsel) re: order filed [7-1] (KMG) (ADI-ICMS,).
8
12/17/2004
NEWSPAPER INFORMATION IN RESPONSE by pla Fun Time Boat R&S to order filed [7-1]
9
12/17/2004
NOTICE by pla Fun Time Boat R&S of Filing
10
01/06/2005
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that the pla shall no later than the day of the second publication of the Court's Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability mail a copy of the notice to every person known to have made any claim against the vessel or the pla arising out of the voyage or trip on which the claims sought to be exonerated or limited arose. FURTHER ORDERED that the pla shall file proof of publication no later than 3/31/05. FURTHER ORDERED that the pla shall no later than 4/29/05 mail to the attorney for each claimant, or to the claimant if unrepresented, a list setting forth a) the naem of each claimant, b) the name and address of each claimant's attorney (if the claimant is known to have one), c) the nature of each claimant's claim, and d) the amount thereof, and shall file a notice of said mailing with the Court. (cc: all counsel) re: order filed [10-1] (KMG) (ADI-ICMS,).
11
01/06/2005
NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY.by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt re: as to Court Order filed at docket #10. (cc: all counsel) (KMG) (ADI-ICMS,).
12
01/12/2005
MOTION For Modifaction/To Amend Court Order filed on 1/6/05 [10-1] re publication of the Court's Notice by pla Fun Time Boat R&S [12-1]
13
01/12/2005
AFFIDAVIT of Michael G. Kelley, Esq. in support of motion For Modifaction/To Amend Court Order filed on 1/6/05 [10-1] re publication of the Court's Notice by pla Fun Time Boat R&S [12-1] [12-1] by pla Fun Time Boat R&S
14
01/14/2005
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that pla's Request for Modifaction/To Amend Court Order filed on 1/6/05 [10-1], is granted to the extent that the Court's order of publication, entered on 1/6/05 (doc.#10) is modified solely as follows: the pla shall immediately publish the Court's Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability in both the Yakima Herald-Republic and in the Bellingham Herald rather than in The Olympian. The remainder of the Court's Order of 1/6/05 shall remain in full force and effect. [12-1] (cc: all counsel) (KMG) (ADI-ICMS,).
15
01/27/2005
NOTICE by pla Fun Time Boat R&S of Mailing Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability
16
01/28/2005
FIRST AMENDED NOTICE by pla Fun Time Boat R&S of Mailing the Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability
17
02/25/2005
PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Fun Time Boat R&S of Publication of the Court's Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability (Published in the Yakima Herald-Republic, Inc. on 1/21/05, 1/28/05, 2/4/05 and 2/11/05.)
18
03/28/2005
ANSWER to complaint (amended) [5-1] by Dfts Kimberly Gonzales, David Gonzales, Janice Gonzales
19
04/06/2005
NOTICE by pla Fun Time Boat R&S of Rule F(6) Information - Providing all claimants: Kimberly Gonzales, Janice Gonzales and David Gonzales
20
04/28/2005
MOTION (APPLICATION) for injunction enjoining prosecution of any action or proceeding against pla or pla's property with respect to any claim subject to exoneration or limitation of the instant action by pla Fun Time Boat R&S with memo in support [20-1]
21
04/28/2005
DECLARATION of Michael G Kelley Esq re motion for injunction enjoining prosecution of any action or proceeding against pla or pla's property with respect to any claim subject to exoneration or limitation of the instant action by pla Fun Time Boat R&S with memo in support [20-1] [20-1] by pla Fun Time Boat R&S
22
04/28/2005
REQUEST by pla Fun Time Boat R&S for Clerk's entry of default (as to dfts Corrin Michelle Osborne, Crystal Marie Vanillo and Tanner Wakefield)
23
04/28/2005
DECLARATION of Michael G Kelley re request for Clerk to enter default [22-1] by pla Fun Time Boat R&S
24
05/05/2005
Application for entry of default as to dft Corrin Osborne, dft Tanner Wakefield - DEFAULT ENTERED by Deputy Clerk (cc: all counsel/PGR) (cc: all counsel) (LAD) (ADI-ICMS,).
25
05/09/2005
MOTION (Application) for entry of default as to Crystal Marie Danillo by pla Fun Time Boat R&S [25-1]
26
05/09/2005
DECLARATION of Michael G Kelley re motion for entry of default as to Crystal Marie Danillo by pla Fun Time Boat R&S [25-1] by pla Fun Time Boat R&S
27
05/10/2005
DEFAULT ENTERED (re motion for entry of default as to Crystal Marie Danillo by pla Fun Time Boat R&S [25-1] as to dft/claimant Crystal Marie Danillo (cc: all counsel) (DMT) (ADI-ICMS,).
28
05/11/2005
NOTICE OF ERRATA by pla to Declaration in support of application for injunction [21-1] (DMT) Modified on 05/12/2005
29
05/23/2005
RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Crystal Danillo re default entered [27-1] returned as unknown, unable to forward
30
07/29/2005
ORDER granting plaintiff's application enjoining prosecution of other related actions 20. Signed by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt on 7/29/05.
31
08/02/2005
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC.
32
07/29/2005
Notice of Mailing by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC re 30 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
33
08/02/2005
STATEMENT of Exhibits re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC.
1
#
2
#
3
)
3 Attachments
34
08/02/2005
Exhibit List by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC.
1
#
2
#
3
#
4
#
5
#
6
#
7
#
8
#
9
#
10
#
11
)
11 Attachments
35
08/24/2005
RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Depositions filed by Kimberly Gonzales, David Gonzales, Janice Gonzales.
36
09/09/2005
REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC.
37
09/09/2005
DECLARATION of Declaration re 36 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC.
1
#
2
#
3
#
4
#
5
#
6
#
7
#
8
#
9
#
10
#
11
#
12
#
13
)
13 Attachments
38
10/10/2005
Notice re Errata by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 34 Exhibit List, 33 Statement
1
#
2
#
3
)
3 Attachments
39
10/27/2005
SUPPLEMENT of Supplemental Citation of Authority for Reply to Apparent Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Fun Time Boat Rental & Storage LLC re 36 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC.
40
03/10/2006
Notice re Notice of Pending MSJ by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC
41
03/21/2006
ORDER AND OPINION that Claimants' Request for Continuance to ConductDiscovery (doc. #35) is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Order of Injunction (doc. #30), entered on July 29, 2005, is dissolved to the extent that it enjoins the prosecutionin the Mohave County Superior Court of claims against defendants in Gonzales v.Fun Time Boat Rental & Storage, LLC, No. S-8015-CV-20050304, other than FunTime Boat Rental & Storage, LLC.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment byPlaintiff Fun Time Boat Rental & Storage, LLC 31 is granted to the extentthat Fun Times Boat Rental & Storage, LLC is exonerated from any and allliability for the injuries suffered by Kimberly Gonzales on March 24, 2004. TheClerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/20/06.
42
03/21/2006
JUDGMENT-IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Fun Time Boat Rental & Storage, LLC (doc. #31) is granted to the extent that Fun Time Boat Rental & Storage, LLC is exonerated from any and all liability for the injuries suffered by Kimberly Gonzales on March 24, 2004. Having granted Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED entering judgment and terminating this action.
43
03/29/2006
BILL OF COSTS with Declaration and Exhibits by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC.
1
Exhibit Exhibits A to M#
2
Exhibit Exhibits N to X
2 Attachments
44
04/07/2006
OBJECTION TO BILL OF COSTS by Defendants Kimberly Gonzales, David Gonzales, Janice Gonzales, Kimberly Gonzales, David Gonzales, Janice Gonzales filed by Kimberly Gonzales, David Gonzales, Janice Gonzales, Kimberly Gonzales, David Gonzales, Janice Gonzales.
45
07/19/2006
Taxation of Costs in amount of $ 1,252.00 against Defendant.Signed by Chief Deputy Michael O'Brien on 7/19/06.
46
08/10/2006
Notice re Stipulation by Fun Time Boat Rentals & Storage, LLC Notice of Stipulation
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.