Gabrielle Shontae Rowser
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-01711 (alnb)

Order Conditionally Denying Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. (Related Doc # [33]) Signed on 1/24/2018.

Van−122 [TMD Order] (Rev. 08/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−01711−DSC13 Gabrielle Shontae Rowser Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−8139 Debtor(s) ORDER This matter came before the Court on 1/23/18 for a hearing on the Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Case is CONVERTED to Chapter 7 on Debtor's Notice of Conversion. Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. 1. The Debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on 2/22/18 and, 2. The Debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on the dates due and on or before the 22nd day of each month thereafter. If the Debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the Debtor and Debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS the case without further notice or hearing. Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. OTHER: Dated: January 24, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge cdr Case 17-01711-DSC13 Doc 39 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 15:17:51 Desc Order on TMD Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/19/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Gabrielle Shontae Rowser
2
04/19/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser.
3
04/19/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser
5
04/19/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser.
6
04/19/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser.
7
04/19/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser.
8
04/19/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/06/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 08/15/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/16/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/17/2017.
9
04/19/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser.
10
04/20/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
04/20/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
12
04/21/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser).
13
04/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/21/2017.
14
04/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/22/2017.
15
04/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser). Notice Date 04/23/2017.
04/24/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser Case Number 03-07787, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/05/2003, Dismissed for Other Reason on 08/16/2005; Case Number 00-06045, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/28/2000, Dismissed for Other Reason on 11/13/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
05/17/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/17/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
06/01/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
06/02/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/6/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
06/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/04/2017.
20
06/09/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/9/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/18/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
06/09/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 102.95 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/09/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01711-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (102.95) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20798561. Fee Amount 102.95 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/11/2017.
22
06/12/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 4 of GFC Lending, LLC in the amount of $5,757.99 Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser. (Shinn, J.)
23
06/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser). Hearing scheduled 7/18/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
06/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/15/2017.
25
07/18/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 4 - Objection is sustained and claim number 4 is disallowed. Signed on 7/18/2017 (RE: related document(s) 22 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser).
07/20/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 102.95 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01711-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (102.95) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20947037. Fee Amount 102.95 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/20/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
27
07/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 07/21/2017.
28
07/26/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustee's Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 7/26/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
29
07/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 07/28/2017.
30
08/08/2017
Withdrawal of Claims: 4 Filed by Creditors GFC Lending, LLC, GFC Lending, LLC.
08/22/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 104.10 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01711-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (104.10) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21073322. Fee Amount 104.10 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/17/2017
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Bridgecrest Credit Company LLC (Claim No. 3) To JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor Jefferson Capital Systems LLC.
10/17/2017
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(17-01711-DSC13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21291477. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 32) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
12/13/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
34
12/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 33 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
35
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
36
01/11/2018
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser (RE: related document(s) 33 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
37
01/11/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 36 Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debtor Gabrielle Shontae Rowser). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
01/24/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 33 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
39
01/24/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. (Related Doc # [33]) Signed on 1/24/2018.
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.