Garrie G. McTaggart
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00196 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
66
08/24/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
67
08/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
68
09/14/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
69
09/14/2018
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
70
09/14/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
09/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
10/02/2018
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
72
10/07/2018
Hearing
73
10/07/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
10/10/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
75
11/14/2018
Certificate of Service
76
11/14/2018
Change of Address
11/14/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
11/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
78
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.