Garry Eugene Melsom and Lori Marie Durham-Melsom
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00349 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/15/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/15/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/15/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
4
10/15/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
10/15/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
10/16/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
10/16/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
10/16/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
12
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
10/27/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
10/31/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
18
10/31/2018
Certificate of Service
19
11/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
20
11/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
12/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
22
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
24
12/15/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
25
01/08/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
26
01/10/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
27
01/25/2019
Non-Opposition
28
02/05/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
29
02/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
30
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
31
03/12/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
32
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
33
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.