Gary E Swan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00111 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/10/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Gary e Swan
12
06/15/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
13
07/19/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
14
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/25/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.