Gary Eugene Gallemore and Ariel Lynn Gallemore
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00283 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
08/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
08/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
08/30/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
08/30/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/30/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
08/30/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
08/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
09/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
10/04/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
16
11/19/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
17
11/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
11/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
11/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
11/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
11/27/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
11/29/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
12/03/2018
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
23
12/04/2018
Extend Entry of Discharge
24
12/10/2018
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
25
12/13/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
26
12/31/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing
27
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.