Gary Shawn Fritz
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00369 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/29/2016
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Gary Shawn Fritz
143
12/06/2018
Turnover of Property (Under Sec 542 and 543)
12/07/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
144
12/27/2018
Generic Motion / Application
145
12/28/2018
Generic Motion
12/28/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
146
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
147
01/11/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
01/14/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.