Geanes v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00248 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
05/22/2018
Answer to Complaint
9
05/22/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
10
06/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11
07/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
12
08/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
13
02/14/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
14
02/19/2019
Judgment
15
02/20/2019
Bill of Costs
16
03/04/2019
Order
17
05/01/2019
Attorney Fees
18
05/06/2019
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.