Gebhardt v. AK Supply, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90008 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/29/2017
Complaint in bankruptcy adversary proceedings: Gebhardt and ak Supply, Inc.
12
09/05/2018
Certificate of Service
14
09/25/2018
Case Status Report
15
09/26/2018
Hearing
16
10/26/2018
Case Status Report
17
10/31/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
18
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
19
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
20
03/08/2019
Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
03/14/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
Calendar Remark (Settled / Removed) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.