Gebhardt v. Blue Water Navigation, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90012 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
09/05/2018
Certificate of Service
11
09/25/2018
Case Status Report
12
09/26/2018
Hearing
13
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
14
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
15
11/15/2018
Default Judgment (SA)
11/15/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.