Gebhardt v. Great Northern Testing, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90044 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
09/28/2018
Case Status Report
15
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
16
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
17
11/26/2018
Hearing
18
12/10/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
19
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
01/10/2019
Update Deadline (Reset Adversary Answer) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/10/2019
Strike
22
01/10/2019
Proceeding Memo
23
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
24
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
02/05/2019
Entry of Default
26
02/13/2019
Entry of Default
27
02/14/2019
Default Judgment
28
02/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.