Gebhardt v. Kenai Aviation, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90055 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
09/28/2018
Case Status Report
14
10/29/2018
Default Judgment
15
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
16
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
17
11/07/2018
Default Judgment
18
11/26/2018
Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.