Gebhardt v. Miller
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90072 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
09/28/2018
Case Status Report
9
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
10
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
12/13/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.