Gebhardt v. Northair, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90023 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/29/2017
Complaint in bankruptcy adversary proceedings: Gebhardt and Northair, Inc.
24
09/05/2018
Certificate of Service
25
09/25/2018
Case Status Report
26
10/22/2018
Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
27
10/22/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
28
10/22/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
10/24/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.