Gebhardt v. Petroleum Equipment & Services, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90049 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
09/28/2018
Case Status Report
11
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
12
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
13
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
12/13/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.