Gebhardt v. Resource Energy Solutions, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90058 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
19
06/20/2018
Case Status Report
20
06/22/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
21
09/05/2018
Certificate of Service
22
09/25/2018
Case Status Report
23
10/26/2018
Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
24
10/29/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
11/19/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.