Gebhardt v. SA Operating Company, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90073 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
09/28/2018
Case Status Report
18
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
19
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
20
12/11/2018
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
12/13/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.