Gebhardt v. TH1 LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90030 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
09/05/2018
Certificate of Service
15
09/25/2018
Case Status Report
16
09/26/2018
Hearing
17
11/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
19
11/15/2018
Default Judgment (SA)
20
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
12/14/2018
Clerks Notice of Undeliverable Mail
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.