Gebhardt v. Tarpon Pipe & Supply LP
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90053 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
06/06/2018
Entry of Default
8
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
07/11/2018
Generic Motion / Application
10
07/19/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
07/20/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/04/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/28/2018
Case Status Report
14
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
15
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
16
11/19/2018
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
11/28/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.