Gelboim v. Credit Suisse Group AG
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-01989 (ca2)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076297] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/11/2017 06:50 PM]

Case 17-1989, Document 149, 09/11/2017, 2121285, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: Gelboim v Credit Suisse Group AG _____ Docket No.: 17-1989 ________ Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Jonathan Ohring Firm: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Address: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005 Telephone: (212) 530-5147 ___________________________ Fax: 212-822-5147 E-mail: JOhring@milbank.com Appearance for: Coöperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. (n/k/a Coöperatieve Rabobank U.A.)/Defendant-Appellee (party/designation) Select One: G Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) G Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel: _______) (name/firm) G Additional counsel (co-counsel with: David R. Gelfand/Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP ✔) (name/firm) G Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: ✔ G I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on OR G I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Jonathan Ohring Type or Print Name: Jonathan Ohring

LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 10/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2149967] [17-1989] [Entered: 10/17/2017 05:49 PM]

Case 17-1989, Document 173, 10/17/2017, 2149967, Page1 of 1 Brookfield Place, 200 Vesey Street, 20th Floor New York, NY 10281 Telephone: 212-415-8600 Fax: 212-303-2754 www.lockelord.com R. James DeRose III Direct Telephone: 212-812-8329 Direct Fax: 212-812-8379 rderose@lockelord.com October 17, 2017 VIA ECF Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe Clerk of the Court U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, New York 10007 Re: Gelboim v. Credit Suisse Group AG, 17-1989-CV Dear Ms. Wolfe: This firm represents HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC, defendants in the action that underlies the referenced appeal. Attorneys from Locke Lord filed appearances in this matter on behalf of these entities on July 12 and 13, 2017. See ECF Dkt. Nos. 64, 66, 67 and 77. Subsequent to that, Plaintiffs-Appellants filed an Amended Notice of Appeal in the district court and notified this court of that Amended Notice. See ECF Dkt. No. 124. The Amended Notice states that the appealed-from judgment had been modified "to apply to all defendants other than … HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC" and certain others. Id. Accordingly, since the district court judgment does not apply to HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC, we ask that HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC not be considered appellees and that the designation Defendant-Appellee for both HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC be removed from the docket. Regards, LOCKE LORD LLP R. James DeRose III cc: All Counsel (via ECF) Atlanta Austin Boston Chicago Cincinnati Dallas Hartford Hong Kong Houston London Los Angeles Miami Morristown New Orleans New York Providence San Francisco Stamford Washington DC West Palm Beach

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 11/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169836] [17-1989] [Entered: 11/10/2017 02:00 PM]

Case 17-1989, Document 177, 11/10/2017, 2169836, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: In Re: Libor-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation _____ Docket No.: 17-1989 ________ Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Mary Beth Forshaw Firm: Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP Address: 425 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY 10017 Telephone: 212-455-2000 ___________________________ Fax: 212-455-2502 E-mail: mforshaw@stblaw.com Appearance for: JPMorgan Chase & Co./Defendant-Appellee; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A./Defendant-Appellee (party/designation) Select One: G Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) G Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel: _______) (name/firm) G Additional counsel (co-counsel with: Thomas C. Rice/Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP ✔) (name/firm) G Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: ✔ G I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on June 16, 2014 OR G I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Mary Beth Forshaw Type or Print Name: Mary Beth Forshaw

MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2231975] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 11:57 AM]

Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page1 of 12 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 Telephone: 212-857-8500 MOTION INFORMATION STATEMENT Docket Number(s): ________________________________________ _______________Caption [use short title]_____________________ Motion for: ______________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ Set forth below precise, complete statement of relief sought: ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ MOVING PARTY:_______________________________________ OPPOSING PARTY:____________________________________________ ___Plaintiff ___Defendant ___Appellant/Petitioner ___Appellee/Respondent Robert S. Kitchenoff MOVING ATTORNEY:___________________________________ OPPOSING ATTORNEY:________________________________________ [name of attorney, with firm, address, phone number and e-mail] Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC ________________________________________________________ _______________________________________________________________ 100 South Broad Street, Suite 705 Philadelphia, PA 19110 _______________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ (215) 545-7200; kitchenoff@wka-law.com ________________________________________________________ _______________________________________________________________ Court- Judge/ Agency appealed from: _________________________________________________________________________________________ Please check appropriate boxes: FOR EMERGENCY MOTIONS, MOTIONS FOR STAYS AND INJUCTIONS PENDING APPEAL: Has movant notified opposing counsel (required by Local Rule 27.1): Has this request for relief been made below? ___Yes ___No ___Yes ___No (explain):__________________________ Has this relief been previously sought in this court? ___Yes ___No _______________________________________________ Requested return date and explanation of emergency: ________________ _____________________________________________________________ Opposing counsel's position on motion: _____________________________________________________________ ___Unopposed ___Opposed ___Don't Know _____________________________________________________________ Does opposing counsel intend to file a response: _____________________________________________________________ ___Yes ___No ___Don't Know Is oral argument on motion requested? ___Yes ___No (requests for oral argument will not necessarily be granted) Has argument date of appeal been set? ___ Yes ___No If yes, enter date:_______________________________________________________ Signature of Moving Attorney: /s/ Robert S. Kitchenoff _________________________________ Feb. 8, 2018 Service by: ___CM/ECF ___Other [Attach proof of service] Date:__________________ Form T-1080 (rev.12-13) Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page2 of 12 ATTACHMENT # 1 OPPOSING PARTIES AND COUNSEL Page A-1 BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION COÖPERATIEVE CENTRALE and BANK OF AMERICA N.A. RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A. Robert Frank Wise, Jr. David Robert Gelfand Arthur J. Burke Sean Miles Murphy Paul Steel Mishkin Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Adam G. Mehes (NYC) Davis Polk & Wardwell 28 Liberty Street 450 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10005 New York, NY 10017 (212) 530-5000 (212) 450-4000 dgelfand@milbank.com rwise@dpw.com smurphy@milbank.com arthur.burke@dpw.com paul.mishkin@dpw.com Melanie Westover Yanez adam.mehes@dpw.com Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP (DC) CITIBANK NA and CITIGROUP, INC. 1850 K Street NW Alan M. Wiseman Washington, DC 20006-5417 Thomas A. Isaacson (202) 835-7500 myanez@milbank.com Jonathan James Gimblett Andrew D. Lazerow Covington & Burling LLP (DC) CREDIT SUISSE GROUP, AG 850 10th Street NW Joel Laurence Kurtzberg Washington, DC 20001 Herbert Scott Washer (202) 662-6000 Elai E. Katz awiseman@cov.com Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP tisaacson@cov.com 80 Pine Street jgimblett@cov.com New York, NY 10005 alazerow@cov.com (212)701-3000 jkurtzberg@cahill.com Andrew Arthur Ruffino hwasher@cahill.com Covington & Burling LLP (NYC) ekatz@cahill.com 620 Eighth Avenue New York, NY 10018-1405 DEUTSCHE BANK AG (212) 841-1000 Moses Silverman aruffino@cov.com Aiden John Synott Hallie Goldblatt Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP 1285 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019 (212)373-3000 msilverman@paulweiss.com asynnott@paulweiss.com hgoldblatt@paulweiss.com Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page3 of 12 ATTACHMENT # 1 OPPOSING PARTIES AND COUNSEL Page A-2 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. and ROYAL BANK OF CANADA JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. Arthur W. Hahn Thomas C. Rice Christian T. Kemnitz Paul C. Gluckow Brian J. Poronsky Alan C. Turner Matthew W. Haws Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP 425 Lexington Avenue 525 W. Monroe Street New York, NY 10017 Chicago, IL 60661 (212) 455-3040 (312) 902-5241 trice@stblaw.com arthur.hahn@kattenlaw.com pgluckow@stblaw.com christian.kemnitz@kattenlaw.com aturner@stblaw.com brian.poronsky@kattenlaw.com matthew.haws@kattenlaw.com Abram J. Ellis Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP THE BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI 900 G Street NW UFJ, LTD. Washington, DC 20001 Daryl Andrew Libow (202) 636-5500 Christopher Michaeal Viapiano aellis@stblaw.com Sullivan & Cromwell LLP 1700 New York Avenue, NW LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC Washington, DC 20006 Marc Joel Gottridge (202) 956-7650 Lisa Jean Fried libowd@sullcrom.com Eric Jonathan Stock viapianoc@sullcrom.com Hogan Lovells US LLP (NYC) 875 Third Avenue THE NORINCHUKIN BANK New York, NY 10022 Andrew W. Stern (212) 918-3000 Alan M. Unger Marc.gottridge@hoganlovells.com Thomas Andrew Paskowitz Lisa.fried@hoganlovells.com Sidley Austin, LLP Eric.stock@hoganlovells.com 787 Seventh Avenue New York, NY 10019 Megan Poly Davis (212) 839-5785 Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP astern@sidley.com One Liberty Plaza aunger@sidley.com New York, NY 10006 tpaskowitz@sidley.com (212) 412-9500 mdavis@fzwz.com William J. Nissen Sidley Austin, LLP One South Dearborn Chicago, IL 60603 (312) 853-7000 wnissen@sidley.com Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page4 of 12 ATTACHMENT # 1 OPPOSING PARTIES AND COUNSEL Page A-3 THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND WESTLB AG and WESTDEUTSCHE GROUP PLC IMMOBILIENBANK AG David Sapir Lesser Christopher Martin Paparella Andrea J. Robinson Wilmer, Cutler, Hale & Dorr, LLP Ethan Edward Litwin 7 World Trade Center Morgan Jessen Feder Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP New York, NY 10007 (212) 230-8882 One Battery Park Plaza david.lesser@wilmerhale.com New York, NY 10004 andrea.robinson@wilmerhale.com (212) 837-6894 paparella@hugheshubbard.com Robert Houck litwin@hugheshubbard.com feder@hugheshubbard.com Clifford Chance US, LLP 31 West 52nd Street New York, NY 10019 (212) 878-3224 robert.houck@cliffordchance.com Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page5 of 12 MOTION FOR (1) PARTIAL SEVERANCE OF APPEAL, (2) STAY OF THE SEVERED APPEAL, AND (3) LIMITED REMAND THEREOF FOR THE DISTRICT COURT TO CONSIDER SETTLEMENT APPROVAL UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 23(e) INTRODUCTION Appellants Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher s, by their attorneys, move for (1) severance of their appeal (No. 17-1989), with respect only to Appellees Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., (2) stay of the severed appeal, and (3) remand of that portion of the matter for the district court to consider preliminary and final approval of a proposed class action settlement between Bondholders and Citi pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(e).1 Citi joins in the request for this relief. Under Rule 23(e), the Settlement must be approved by the district court. The purpose of this motion is to permit the required approval process to occur. If this Court approves the severance, stay, and limited remand, Bondholders will move the district court for preliminary approval of the Settlement, and if preliminary approval is granted, for final approval and effectuation of the Settlement. 1 This motion seeks severance only with respect to Citi and only with respect -1989. This motion and the relief requested do not apply to the other consolidated appeals in which Citi is a party. Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page6 of 12 BACKGROUND This antitrust action was brought as a class action against the 16 international banks (and related companies) that together constituted the panel of banks whose individual daily submissions the British Bankers Association used to compile and publish LIBOR rates, the most commonly used benchmark for dollar- based interest rates. Bondholders claim that between 2007 and 2010, the defendant banks collusively submitted suppressed interest rates, as a direct result of which Bondholders and those similarly situated received less interest than they should have on bonds they held that paid interest at a rate expressly tied to LIBOR. Because, United States v. Heilbroner, 100 F.2d 379, 381 (2d Cir. 1938) Bondholders brought a claim against the 16 banks for unlawful concerted price fixing under Sherman Act § 1, 15 U.S.C. § 1. This case was previously before this Court. Initially, the district court dismissed the case, In re LIBOR Based Fin. Instruments Antitrust Litig., 935 F. LIBOR I judgment and remanded for further proceedings. See Gelboim v. Bank of Am. Corp., 823 F.3d 759 (2d Cir. 2016), cert. denied, 137 S.Ct. 814, 196 L.Ed.2d 599 (U.S. 2017), on remand from Gelboim v. Bank of Am. Corp., 574 U.S., 135 S.Ct. 897, 190 L.Ed.2d 789 (2015). Following remand from this Court, 2 Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page7 of 12 Bondholders settled with three banks.2 The district court again dismissed this action, see In re LIBOR-Based Fin. Instruments Antitrust Litig., 2016 WL 7378980 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 20, 2016) (LIBOR VI), and subsequently entered a partial final judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) dismissing the action against all defendants except the three banks that, as of that time, had settled with Bondholders. (ECF No. 2095). After this appeal (No. 17-1989) was docketed and consolidated with several other appeals raising similar issues, and after Bondholders reached an agreement of settlement with Citi. A Settlement Agreement was executed on January 10, 2018. ARGUMENT The Requested Severance, Stay, and Remand will Further The Prompt Resolution of Both Approval of the Citi Settlement and the Merits of the Pending Appeal Not Stayed. 1. The Court should sever appeal as to Citi. Judicial policy strongly favors settlement of class-action litigation. See In re 147 F.3d 132, 138 (2d Cir. 1998) (There is a 2 These three settling banks are Barclays Bank PLC, UBS AG, and HSBC Bank plc. The settlement with HSBC Bank plc encompassed a dismissal of its holding company, HSBC Holdings plc. On July 5, 2017, the district court granted preliminary approval of these settlements under Rule 23(e), ECF No. 2048, but has yet to approve a plan of allocation and notice to the class. Following notice, the court will hold a hearing to consider final approval of these settlements. 3 Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page8 of 12 litigation is encouraged by the courts and favored by public policy Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., 396 F.3d 96, 117 (2d Cir. 2005) (internal quotation marks omitted). The Court has recognized e settlement before trial is even stronger in the context of large- Bano v. Union Carbide Corp., 273 F.3d 120, 129-130 (2d Cir. 2001), quoting In re Exxon Valdez, 229 F.3d 790, 795 (9th Cir. 2000). The relief sought in the present motion will further that strong judicial policy while permitting the merits of the appeal as to the non- settling appellees to proceed unabated. Further, the relief sought will promote efficiency below by enabling the district court to consider preliminary approval of the Settlement with Citi, and if it preliminarily approves, to consider further proceedings alongside those for the settlements already before that court. To promote fair and appropriate management of matters before it, including to further settlement among parties, this Court may sever parties and issues in appeals, and it has done so in the past. See, e.g., U.S. v. Sassano, 293 Fed. Appx. 100, 100 n.1 (2d Cir. 2008) (co- Whelan v. Brinegar, 538 F.2d 924, 926 (2d Cir. 1976) In re Prudence Bonds Corp. 4 Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page9 of 12 [were] effected in the appeals which have been severed and discontinued Other Circuits have also severed portions of an appeal, while proceeding with the remaining issues and parties. See, e.g., Lancaster v. Monroe County, Ala., 116 F.3d 1419, 1429 (11th Cir. 1997) (appeal severed as to governmental defendants and resolved only as to individual defendants;); U.S. v. Carranza, 645 Fed. Appx. 297, 300 n.1 (4th Cir. 2016) (where two convictions were subject to a single judgment, appeal as to one conviction severed from appeal as to the other); Sandwich Chef of Texas, Inc. v. Reliance Nat. Indem. Ins. Co., 319 F.3d 205, 212 n.3 (5th Cir. 2003) (some defendant-appellants severed and appeal stayed as to them); Southland Sec. Corp. v. INSpire Ins. Solutions, Inc., 365 F.3d 353, 359 n.1 (5th Cir. 2004) (appeal as to one appellee severed and stayed); U.S. v. Mount, 1991 WL 7663 (D.C. Cir. 1991) (per curiam) (appeal severed as to convictions on three counts which were then vacated). The requested severance is thus clearly authorized in this case. 2. The Court should stay the severed appeal until 30 days after the Rule 23(e) proceedings on the Settlement are complete. A stay of the severed appeal is appropriate to promote a settlement of this class action litigation. See Ligon v. City of New York, 743 F.3d 362 (2d Cir. 2014) (appeal in class action stayed to permit limited remand to district court for settlement mediation). Such a stay will preserve the current status quo as between Bondholders and Citi until the Settlement is finally approved or disapproved under 5 Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page10 of 12 Rule 23(e). This procedure will also permit the present appeal to proceed unabated with respect to appellees that have not settled.3 Rule 23(e) requires the district court approval of a class action settlement. The customary procedures include preliminary approval of a proposed settlement, certification of a settlement class, approval of plans of allocation of the settlement proceeds and of notice to class members, a period for notice to the class and for any objections or exclusions, and a hearing on a motion for final approval. It is therefore likely that the Rule 23(e) process will take many months, and could involve an appeal. The requested stay would expire by its terms 30 days after completion of the Rule 23(e) proceedings and any related appeal. At that time, if the Settlement has been approved, the severed appeal as to Citi could be dismissed, and if the Settlement has been disapproved, the severed appeal as to Citi will proceed in a fashion appropriate at that time. 3 Dismissal of the severed appeal without prejudice to reinstatement pursuant to Second Circuit Local Rule 42.1 would not adequately protect Bondholders and the class. Although not addressing Rule 42.1, this Court has held that the procedure the appeal beyond the original appeal period. See U.S. v. Vilar, 645 F.3d 543, 547 so that any attempt to reinstate the appeal after the time for filing a notice of appeal never ousts us of appellate jurisdiction, it avoids the jurisdictional constraints of Rule 4. Id. 6 Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page11 of 12 3. After the severed appeal has been stayed, the Court should remand the matter to the district court for the limited purpose of considering approval of the Settlement as provided in Rule 23(e). The purpose of the requested stay is to permit remand of the severed action as to Citi so the district court may consider approving and ordering effectuation of the Settlement. This Court has previously employed a stay and limited remand to further the possibility that parties might negotiate a settlement of a class action. See Ligon, supra. A fortiori, since in this case there already is a fully executed Settlement ready for the district court consideration, this Court should grant the requested remand. See also, e.g., In re Crocs, Inc. Sec. Litig., 2013 WL 4547404 at *1 could consider fully the parties proposed class settlement.); Nieberding v. Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc., 2015 WL 1645798 at *2 (D. Kan., April 14, 2015) appropriate proceedings necessary to consider Dugan v. Towers, Perrin, Forster & Crosby, Inc., 2013 WL 5330116 at *1 (E.D. Pa., September 24, 2013) (limited remand where parties negotiated class action settlement during pendency of appeal). 7 Case 17-1989, Document 282, 02/08/2018, 2231975, Page12 of 12 WHEREFORE, Bondholders respectfully request that the Court sever Appeal No. 17-1989 as to Citi only, stay the severed appeal until 30 days after completion of the Rule 23(e) proceedings and any related appeal, and remand the severed matter for the limited purpose of proceedings in the district court pursuant to Rule 23(e), while retaining appellate jurisdiction to conduct appropriate proceedings in the severed appeal after expiration of the stay. /s/ Karen L. Morris /s/ David H. Weinstein Karen L. Morris David H. Weinstein Patrick F. Morris Robert S. Kitchenoff R. Michael Lindsey WEINSTEIN KITCHENOFF & MORRIS AND MORRIS ASHER LLC COUNSELORS AT LAW LLC 100 South Broad Street, Suite 705 4023 Kennett Pike, #254 Philadelphia, PA 19110 Wilmington, DE 19807 Tele: (215) 545-7200 Tele: (302) 426-0400 Attorneys for Bondholder Plaintiffs-Appellants (Appeal No. 17-1989) Dated: February 8, 2018 8

MOTION, to stay, to remand appeal, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2232152] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 01:42 PM]

Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page1 of 12 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 Telephone: 212-857-8500 MOTION INFORMATION STATEMENT Docket Number(s): ________________________________________ _______________Caption [use short title]_____________________ Motion for: ______________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ Set forth below precise, complete statement of relief sought: ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ MOVING PARTY:_______________________________________ OPPOSING PARTY:____________________________________________ ___Plaintiff ___Defendant ___Appellant/Petitioner ___Appellee/Respondent Robert S. Kitchenoff MOVING ATTORNEY:___________________________________ OPPOSING ATTORNEY:________________________________________ [name of attorney, with firm, address, phone number and e-mail] Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC ________________________________________________________ _______________________________________________________________ 100 South Broad Street, Suite 705 Philadelphia, PA 19110 _______________________________________________________________ ________________________________________________________ (215) 545-7200; kitchenoff@wka-law.com ________________________________________________________ _______________________________________________________________ Court- Judge/ Agency appealed from: _________________________________________________________________________________________ Please check appropriate boxes: FOR EMERGENCY MOTIONS, MOTIONS FOR STAYS AND INJUCTIONS PENDING APPEAL: Has movant notified opposing counsel (required by Local Rule 27.1): Has this request for relief been made below? ___Yes ___No ___Yes ___No (explain):__________________________ Has this relief been previously sought in this court? ___Yes ___No _______________________________________________ Requested return date and explanation of emergency: ________________ _____________________________________________________________ Opposing counsel's position on motion: _____________________________________________________________ ___Unopposed ___Opposed ___Don't Know _____________________________________________________________ Does opposing counsel intend to file a response: _____________________________________________________________ ___Yes ___No ___Don't Know Is oral argument on motion requested? ___Yes ___No (requests for oral argument will not necessarily be granted) Has argument date of appeal been set? ___ Yes ___No If yes, enter date:_______________________________________________________ Signature of Moving Attorney: /s/ Robert S. Kitchenoff _________________________________ Feb. 8, 2018 Service by: ___CM/ECF ___Other [Attach proof of service] Date:__________________ Form T-1080 (rev.12-13) Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page2 of 12 ATTACHMENT # 1 OPPOSING PARTIES AND COUNSEL Page A-1 BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION COÖPERATIEVE CENTRALE and BANK OF AMERICA N.A. RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A. Robert Frank Wise, Jr. David Robert Gelfand Arthur J. Burke Sean Miles Murphy Paul Steel Mishkin Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Adam G. Mehes (NYC) Davis Polk & Wardwell 28 Liberty Street 450 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10005 New York, NY 10017 (212) 530-5000 (212) 450-4000 dgelfand@milbank.com rwise@dpw.com smurphy@milbank.com arthur.burke@dpw.com paul.mishkin@dpw.com Melanie Westover Yanez adam.mehes@dpw.com Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP (DC) CITIBANK NA and CITIGROUP, INC. 1850 K Street NW Alan M. Wiseman Washington, DC 20006-5417 Thomas A. Isaacson (202) 835-7500 myanez@milbank.com Jonathan James Gimblett Andrew D. Lazerow Covington & Burling LLP (DC) CREDIT SUISSE GROUP, AG 850 10th Street NW Joel Laurence Kurtzberg Washington, DC 20001 Herbert Scott Washer (202) 662-6000 Elai E. Katz awiseman@cov.com Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP tisaacson@cov.com 80 Pine Street jgimblett@cov.com New York, NY 10005 alazerow@cov.com (212)701-3000 jkurtzberg@cahill.com Andrew Arthur Ruffino hwasher@cahill.com Covington & Burling LLP (NYC) ekatz@cahill.com 620 Eighth Avenue New York, NY 10018-1405 DEUTSCHE BANK AG (212) 841-1000 Moses Silverman aruffino@cov.com Aiden John Synott Hallie Goldblatt Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP 1285 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019 (212)373-3000 msilverman@paulweiss.com asynnott@paulweiss.com hgoldblatt@paulweiss.com Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page3 of 12 ATTACHMENT # 1 OPPOSING PARTIES AND COUNSEL Page A-2 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. and ROYAL BANK OF CANADA JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. Arthur W. Hahn Thomas C. Rice Christian T. Kemnitz Paul C. Gluckow Brian J. Poronsky Alan C. Turner Matthew W. Haws Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP 425 Lexington Avenue 525 W. Monroe Street New York, NY 10017 Chicago, IL 60661 (212) 455-3040 (312) 902-5241 trice@stblaw.com arthur.hahn@kattenlaw.com pgluckow@stblaw.com christian.kemnitz@kattenlaw.com aturner@stblaw.com brian.poronsky@kattenlaw.com matthew.haws@kattenlaw.com Abram J. Ellis Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP THE BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI 900 G Street NW UFJ, LTD. Washington, DC 20001 Daryl Andrew Libow (202) 636-5500 Christopher Michaeal Viapiano aellis@stblaw.com Sullivan & Cromwell LLP 1700 New York Avenue, NW LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC Washington, DC 20006 Marc Joel Gottridge (202) 956-7650 Lisa Jean Fried libowd@sullcrom.com Eric Jonathan Stock viapianoc@sullcrom.com Hogan Lovells US LLP (NYC) 875 Third Avenue THE NORINCHUKIN BANK New York, NY 10022 Andrew W. Stern (212) 918-3000 Alan M. Unger Marc.gottridge@hoganlovells.com Thomas Andrew Paskowitz Lisa.fried@hoganlovells.com Sidley Austin, LLP Eric.stock@hoganlovells.com 787 Seventh Avenue New York, NY 10019 Megan Poly Davis (212) 839-5785 Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP astern@sidley.com One Liberty Plaza aunger@sidley.com New York, NY 10006 tpaskowitz@sidley.com (212) 412-9500 mdavis@fzwz.com William J. Nissen Sidley Austin, LLP One South Dearborn Chicago, IL 60603 (312) 853-7000 wnissen@sidley.com Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page4 of 12 ATTACHMENT # 1 OPPOSING PARTIES AND COUNSEL Page A-3 THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND WESTLB AG and WESTDEUTSCHE GROUP PLC IMMOBILIENBANK AG David Sapir Lesser Christopher Martin Paparella Andrea J. Robinson Wilmer, Cutler, Hale & Dorr, LLP Ethan Edward Litwin 7 World Trade Center Morgan Jessen Feder Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP New York, NY 10007 (212) 230-8882 One Battery Park Plaza david.lesser@wilmerhale.com New York, NY 10004 andrea.robinson@wilmerhale.com (212) 837-6894 paparella@hugheshubbard.com Robert Houck litwin@hugheshubbard.com feder@hugheshubbard.com Clifford Chance US, LLP 31 West 52nd Street New York, NY 10019 (212) 878-3224 robert.houck@cliffordchance.com Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page5 of 12 MOTION FOR (1) PARTIAL SEVERANCE OF APPEAL, (2) STAY OF THE SEVERED APPEAL, AND (3) LIMITED REMAND THEREOF FOR THE DISTRICT COURT TO CONSIDER SETTLEMENT APPROVAL UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 23(e) INTRODUCTION Appellants Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher s, by their attorneys, move for (1) severance of their appeal (No. 17-1989), with respect only to Appellees Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., (2) stay of the severed appeal, and (3) remand of that portion of the matter for the district court to consider preliminary and final approval of a proposed class action settlement between Bondholders and Citi pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(e).1 Citi joins in the request for this relief. Under Rule 23(e), the Settlement must be approved by the district court. The purpose of this motion is to permit the required approval process to occur. If this Court approves the severance, stay, and limited remand, Bondholders will move the district court for preliminary approval of the Settlement, and if preliminary approval is granted, for final approval and effectuation of the Settlement. 1 This motion seeks severance only with respect to Citi and only with respect -1989. This motion and the relief requested do not apply to the other consolidated appeals in which Citi is a party. Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page6 of 12 BACKGROUND This antitrust action was brought as a class action against the 16 international banks (and related companies) that together constituted the panel of banks whose individual daily submissions the British Bankers Association used to compile and publish LIBOR rates, the most commonly used benchmark for dollar- based interest rates. Bondholders claim that between 2007 and 2010, the defendant banks collusively submitted suppressed interest rates, as a direct result of which Bondholders and those similarly situated received less interest than they should have on bonds they held that paid interest at a rate expressly tied to LIBOR. Because, United States v. Heilbroner, 100 F.2d 379, 381 (2d Cir. 1938) Bondholders brought a claim against the 16 banks for unlawful concerted price fixing under Sherman Act § 1, 15 U.S.C. § 1. This case was previously before this Court. Initially, the district court dismissed the case, In re LIBOR Based Fin. Instruments Antitrust Litig., 935 F. LIBOR I judgment and remanded for further proceedings. See Gelboim v. Bank of Am. Corp., 823 F.3d 759 (2d Cir. 2016), cert. denied, 137 S.Ct. 814, 196 L.Ed.2d 599 (U.S. 2017), on remand from Gelboim v. Bank of Am. Corp., 574 U.S., 135 S.Ct. 897, 190 L.Ed.2d 789 (2015). Following remand from this Court, 2 Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page7 of 12 Bondholders settled with three banks.2 The district court again dismissed this action, see In re LIBOR-Based Fin. Instruments Antitrust Litig., 2016 WL 7378980 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 20, 2016) (LIBOR VI), and subsequently entered a partial final judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) dismissing the action against all defendants except the three banks that, as of that time, had settled with Bondholders. (ECF No. 2095). After this appeal (No. 17-1989) was docketed and consolidated with several other appeals raising similar issues, and after Bondholders reached an agreement of settlement with Citi. A Settlement Agreement was executed on January 10, 2018. ARGUMENT The Requested Severance, Stay, and Remand will Further The Prompt Resolution of Both Approval of the Citi Settlement and the Merits of the Pending Appeal Not Stayed. 1. The Court should sever appeal as to Citi. Judicial policy strongly favors settlement of class-action litigation. See In re 147 F.3d 132, 138 (2d Cir. 1998) (There is a 2 These three settling banks are Barclays Bank PLC, UBS AG, and HSBC Bank plc. The settlement with HSBC Bank plc encompassed a dismissal of its holding company, HSBC Holdings plc. On July 5, 2017, the district court granted preliminary approval of these settlements under Rule 23(e), ECF No. 2048, but has yet to approve a plan of allocation and notice to the class. Following notice, the court will hold a hearing to consider final approval of these settlements. 3 Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page8 of 12 litigation is encouraged by the courts and favored by public policy Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., 396 F.3d 96, 117 (2d Cir. 2005) (internal quotation marks omitted). The Court has recognized e settlement before trial is even stronger in the context of large- Bano v. Union Carbide Corp., 273 F.3d 120, 129-130 (2d Cir. 2001), quoting In re Exxon Valdez, 229 F.3d 790, 795 (9th Cir. 2000). The relief sought in the present motion will further that strong judicial policy while permitting the merits of the appeal as to the non- settling appellees to proceed unabated. Further, the relief sought will promote efficiency below by enabling the district court to consider preliminary approval of the Settlement with Citi, and if it preliminarily approves, to consider further proceedings alongside those for the settlements already before that court. To promote fair and appropriate management of matters before it, including to further settlement among parties, this Court may sever parties and issues in appeals, and it has done so in the past. See, e.g., U.S. v. Sassano, 293 Fed. Appx. 100, 100 n.1 (2d Cir. 2008) (co- Whelan v. Brinegar, 538 F.2d 924, 926 (2d Cir. 1976) In re Prudence Bonds Corp. 4 Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page9 of 12 [were] effected in the appeals which have been severed and discontinued Other Circuits have also severed portions of an appeal, while proceeding with the remaining issues and parties. See, e.g., Lancaster v. Monroe County, Ala., 116 F.3d 1419, 1429 (11th Cir. 1997) (appeal severed as to governmental defendants and resolved only as to individual defendants;); U.S. v. Carranza, 645 Fed. Appx. 297, 300 n.1 (4th Cir. 2016) (where two convictions were subject to a single judgment, appeal as to one conviction severed from appeal as to the other); Sandwich Chef of Texas, Inc. v. Reliance Nat. Indem. Ins. Co., 319 F.3d 205, 212 n.3 (5th Cir. 2003) (some defendant-appellants severed and appeal stayed as to them); Southland Sec. Corp. v. INSpire Ins. Solutions, Inc., 365 F.3d 353, 359 n.1 (5th Cir. 2004) (appeal as to one appellee severed and stayed); U.S. v. Mount, 1991 WL 7663 (D.C. Cir. 1991) (per curiam) (appeal severed as to convictions on three counts which were then vacated). The requested severance is thus clearly authorized in this case. 2. The Court should stay the severed appeal until 30 days after the Rule 23(e) proceedings on the Settlement are complete. A stay of the severed appeal is appropriate to promote a settlement of this class action litigation. See Ligon v. City of New York, 743 F.3d 362 (2d Cir. 2014) (appeal in class action stayed to permit limited remand to district court for settlement mediation). Such a stay will preserve the current status quo as between Bondholders and Citi until the Settlement is finally approved or disapproved under 5 Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page10 of 12 Rule 23(e). This procedure will also permit the present appeal to proceed unabated with respect to appellees that have not settled.3 Rule 23(e) requires the district court approval of a class action settlement. The customary procedures include preliminary approval of a proposed settlement, certification of a settlement class, approval of plans of allocation of the settlement proceeds and of notice to class members, a period for notice to the class and for any objections or exclusions, and a hearing on a motion for final approval. It is therefore likely that the Rule 23(e) process will take many months, and could involve an appeal. The requested stay would expire by its terms 30 days after completion of the Rule 23(e) proceedings and any related appeal. At that time, if the Settlement has been approved, the severed appeal as to Citi could be dismissed, and if the Settlement has been disapproved, the severed appeal as to Citi will proceed in a fashion appropriate at that time. 3 Dismissal of the severed appeal without prejudice to reinstatement pursuant to Second Circuit Local Rule 42.1 would not adequately protect Bondholders and the class. Although not addressing Rule 42.1, this Court has held that the procedure the appeal beyond the original appeal period. See U.S. v. Vilar, 645 F.3d 543, 547 so that any attempt to reinstate the appeal after the time for filing a notice of appeal never ousts us of appellate jurisdiction, it avoids the jurisdictional constraints of Rule 4. Id. 6 Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page11 of 12 3. After the severed appeal has been stayed, the Court should remand the matter to the district court for the limited purpose of considering approval of the Settlement as provided in Rule 23(e). The purpose of the requested stay is to permit remand of the severed action as to Citi so the district court may consider approving and ordering effectuation of the Settlement. This Court has previously employed a stay and limited remand to further the possibility that parties might negotiate a settlement of a class action. See Ligon, supra. A fortiori, since in this case there already is a fully executed Settlement ready for the district court consideration, this Court should grant the requested remand. See also, e.g., In re Crocs, Inc. Sec. Litig., 2013 WL 4547404 at *1 could consider fully the parties proposed class settlement.); Nieberding v. Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc., 2015 WL 1645798 at *2 (D. Kan., April 14, 2015) appropriate proceedings necessary to consider Dugan v. Towers, Perrin, Forster & Crosby, Inc., 2013 WL 5330116 at *1 (E.D. Pa., September 24, 2013) (limited remand where parties negotiated class action settlement during pendency of appeal). 7 Case 17-1989, Document 284, 02/08/2018, 2232152, Page12 of 12 WHEREFORE, Bondholders respectfully request that the Court sever Appeal No. 17-1989 as to Citi only, stay the severed appeal until 30 days after completion of the Rule 23(e) proceedings and any related appeal, and remand the severed matter for the limited purpose of proceedings in the district court pursuant to Rule 23(e), while retaining appellate jurisdiction to conduct appropriate proceedings in the severed appeal after expiration of the stay. /s/ Karen L. Morris /s/ David H. Weinstein Karen L. Morris David H. Weinstein Patrick F. Morris Robert S. Kitchenoff R. Michael Lindsey WEINSTEIN KITCHENOFF & MORRIS AND MORRIS ASHER LLC COUNSELORS AT LAW LLC 100 South Broad Street, Suite 705 4023 Kennett Pike, #254 Philadelphia, PA 19110 Wilmington, DE 19807 Tele: (215) 545-7200 Tele: (302) 426-0400 Attorneys for Bondholder Plaintiffs-Appellants (Appeal No. 17-1989) Dated: February 8, 2018 8

LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 03/30/2018 by CM/ECF.[2268656] [17-1989] [Entered: 03/30/2018 12:39 PM]

Case 17-1989, Document 330, 03/30/2018, 2268656, Page1 of 1 100 South Broad Street 215.545.7200 phone Suite 705 215.545.6535 fax Philadelphia, PA 19110 www.wka-law.com ROBERT S. KITCHENOFF | Member | kitchenoff@wka-law.com March 21, 2018 Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: Gelboim v. Credit Suisse A.G., et al; Docket No. 17-1989 Dear Clerk Wolfe: By order dated February 27, 2018, the Court granted the request of Bondholder Plaintiffs (Appellants) and Appellees Citibank, NA and Citigroup, Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred to as Citi) for partial severance of Bondholder's Appeal as to Citi, to hold the severed appeal in abeyance, and for remand to the district court for consideration of a settlement reached by Bond- holders, on behalf of a proposed settlement class, with Citi. A true copy of the Court's order has been entered on the Master Docket in the district court. Case 1:11-md-02262-NRB (ECF No. 2447). The Court's Order directed the parties to provide a status update every thirty (30) days. That update is as follows. The parties are in the process of working through certain obligations under the settlement agreement, and Bondholders have begun the process of preparing the neces- sary motion and exhibits for a motion for preliminary settlement approval. Respectfully, David H. Weinstein Karen L. Morris Robert S. Kitchenoff Patrick F. Morris WEINSTEIN KITCHENOFF & ASHER LLC MORRIS AND MORRIS LLC 100 South Broad Street, Suite 705 COUNSELORS AT LAW Philadelphia, PA 19110-1061 4023 Kennett Pike, Suite 254 Wilmington, DE 19807 Counsel for Appellants cc: All Counsel of Record via ECF

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/16/2017
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. [2065542] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/23/2017 05:17 PM]
2
06/16/2017
DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 12/20/2016, RECEIVED.[2065544] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/23/2017 05:19 PM]
3
06/16/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, district court receipt # 0208-13792384, FILED.[2065545] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/23/2017 05:20 PM]
5
06/16/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2066850] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/27/2017 11:07 AM]
8
06/30/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070451] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/30/2017 05:00 PM]
9
06/30/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070452] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/30/2017 05:01 PM]
10
06/30/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070490] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/30/2017 07:36 PM]
11
06/30/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2070491] [17-1989] [Entered: 06/30/2017 07:39 PM]
12
07/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-1989, [11], ADDED.[2070562] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/05/2017 06:53 AM]
16
07/06/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED. Service date 07/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[2072709] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/06/2017 05:12 PM]
17
07/07/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[2073394] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/07/2017 01:22 PM]
18
07/07/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2073403] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/07/2017 01:28 PM]
19
07/07/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2073407] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/07/2017 01:33 PM]
20
07/07/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2073497] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/07/2017 02:24 PM]
21
07/07/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, FILED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2073739] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/07/2017 04:07 PM]
22
07/07/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2073833] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/07/2017 04:41 PM]
23
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Patrick F Morris for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989, [18], ADDED.[2074056] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:10 AM]
24
07/10/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [19], [18], on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED.[2074064] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:14 AM]
25
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew W. Stern for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-1989, [20], ADDED.[2074083] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:21 AM]
27
07/10/2017
CAPTION, updated to include additional appellee Bank of America, N.A., AMENDED.[2074123] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:32 AM]
28
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur J. Burke, [21], in place of attorney Robert F. Wise, SUBSTITUTED.[2074139] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:37 AM]
29
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989, [22], ADDED.[2074145] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:39 AM]
30
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2074183] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:55 AM]
31
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2074188] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 09:58 AM]
33
07/10/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel[30], [31], on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED.[2074288] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 10:44 AM]
34
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, R. Michael Lindsey for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989, [31], ADDED.[2074292] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 10:45 AM]
35
07/10/2017
NOTICE, to Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Citibank, N.A., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS AG and WestLB AG, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2074332] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 10:59 AM]
37
07/10/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF.[2074416] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 11:32 AM]
38
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by email. [2074444] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 11:41 AM]
39
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2074461] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 11:48 AM]
40
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Unger for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-1989, [38], ADDED.[2074483] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 12:02 PM]
41
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas Andrew Paskowitz for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-1989, [39], ADDED.[2074486] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 12:03 PM]
42
07/10/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF.[2074812] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 03:12 PM]
43
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2074821] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 03:16 PM]
44
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2074839] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 03:20 PM]
45
07/10/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., RECEIVED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF.[2074852] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/10/2017 03:23 PM]
47
07/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Bank of America Corporation Bank of America N.A., in case 17-1989, [43], ADDED.[2075122] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/11/2017 07:10 AM]
48
07/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Bank of America Corporation Bank of America N.A., in case 17-1989, [44], ADDED.[2075123] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/11/2017 07:14 AM]
49
07/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076286] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/11/2017 06:12 PM]
50
07/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076290] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/11/2017 06:30 PM]
51
07/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076297] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/11/2017 06:50 PM]
52
07/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076300] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/11/2017 07:33 PM]
53
07/12/2017
ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser, [49], in place of attorney Alan E. Schoenfeld, SUBSTITUTED.[2076380] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 08:54 AM]
54
07/12/2017
ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [50], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise, SUBSTITUTED.[2076394] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 08:58 AM]
55
07/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [51], ADDED.[2076397] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 09:01 AM]
56
07/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [52], ADDED.[2076399] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 09:03 AM]
59
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076849] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 12:29 PM]
60
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076912] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 01:10 PM]
61
07/12/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2076925] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 01:15 PM]
62
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076930] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 01:22 PM]
63
07/12/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077138] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:16 PM]
64
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077151] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:20 PM]
65
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077185] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:37 PM]
66
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077250] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 04:00 PM]
67
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077270] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 04:08 PM]
68
07/12/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077442] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 05:32 PM]
69
07/12/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077446] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/12/2017 05:55 PM]
70
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [59], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise, SUBSTITUTED.[2077498] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 07:57 AM]
71
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew A. Ruffino, [62], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2077501] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 08:06 AM]
72
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Gregory T. Casamento, [64], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise, SUBSTITUTED.[2077505] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 08:19 AM]
73
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman, [65], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2077507] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 08:21 AM]
74
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, James Matthew Goodin for HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Bank PLC, in case 17-1989, [66], ADDED.[2077508] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 08:23 AM]
75
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, R. James Jude DeRose III for HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Bank PLC, in case 17-1989, [67], ADDED.[2077510] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 08:25 AM]
76
07/13/2017
CAPTION, updated to include WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG as a Defendant-Appellee, AMENDED.[2077529] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 08:43 AM]
77
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077716] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:04 AM]
78
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Roger B. Cowie for HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Bank PLC, in case 17-1989, [77], ADDED.[2077720] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:06 AM]
79
07/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077816] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:51 AM]
80
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077840] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:56 AM]
81
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077848] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:57 AM]
82
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee WestLB AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077853] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:59 AM]
83
07/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2078259] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 02:12 PM]
84
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2078265] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 02:17 PM]
85
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by email. [2078288] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 02:38 PM]
86
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2078295] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 02:45 PM]
87
07/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2078301] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/13/2017 02:48 PM]
88
07/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Aidan Synnott for Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-1989, [80], ADDED.[2078674] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 08:10 AM]
89
07/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher Martin Paparella for WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, in case 17-1989, [81], ADDED.[2078677] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 08:13 AM]
90
07/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher M. Paparella, [82], in place of attorney Robert F. Wise, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2078678] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 08:17 AM]
91
07/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-1989, [84], ADDED.[2078679] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 08:23 AM]
92
07/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-1989, [85], ADDED.[2078680] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 08:24 AM]
93
07/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-1989, [86], ADDED.[2078681] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 08:27 AM]
94
07/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-1989, [87], ADDED.[2078683] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 08:29 AM]
95
07/14/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2079064] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 12:12 PM]
96
07/14/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2079497] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:09 PM]
97
07/14/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2079509] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:15 PM]
98
07/14/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2079526] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:19 PM]
99
07/14/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2079570] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:29 PM]
100
07/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice, [95], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2079726] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:11 AM]
101
07/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul C. Gluckow for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1989, [96], ADDED.[2079729] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:13 AM]
102
07/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1989, [97], ADDED.[2079731] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:14 AM]
103
07/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1989, [98], ADDED.[2079734] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:16 AM]
104
07/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1989, [99], ADDED.[2079736] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:17 AM]
105
07/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2080390] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/17/2017 04:34 PM]
106
07/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2080484] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:06 PM]
107
07/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert T. Smith, [106], in place of attorney Robert F. Wise, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2080556] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/18/2017 09:12 AM]
108
07/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2080581] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/18/2017 09:30 AM]
109
07/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED. Service date 07/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081490] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/18/2017 06:11 PM]
110
07/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED. Service date 07/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081491] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/18/2017 06:13 PM]
111
07/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081507] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/18/2017 09:09 PM]
113
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Marc J. Gottridge, [109], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise, SUBSTITUTED.[2081585] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/19/2017 09:04 AM]
114
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1989, [110], ADDED.[2081586] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/19/2017 09:06 AM]
115
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-1989, [111], ADDED.[2081590] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/19/2017 09:07 AM]
116
07/24/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher enclosing recent District Court Decisions, RECEIVED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2084321] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/24/2017 10:52 AM]
117
07/24/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2085011] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/24/2017 07:16 PM]
118
07/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG and UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2085013] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/24/2017 07:22 PM]
119
07/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG and UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2085015] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/24/2017 07:26 PM]
120
07/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for UBS AG, in case 17-1989, [118], ADDED.[2085120] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/25/2017 09:13 AM]
121
07/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for UBS AG, in case 17-1989, [119], ADDED.[2085121] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/25/2017 09:15 AM]
122
07/25/2017
CAPTION, updated to remove duplicate Party UBS AG, AMENDED.[2085426] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/25/2017 11:27 AM]
123
07/26/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, advising this Court that an Amended Notice of Appeal has been filed, RECEIVED. Service date 07/26/2017 by CM/ECF.[2086982] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/26/2017 04:41 PM]
124
07/26/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher advising this Court that an Amended Notice of Appeal has been filed, RECEIVED. Service date 07/26/2017 by CM/ECF.[2087037] [17-1989] [Entered: 07/26/2017 07:14 PM]
126
08/14/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100567] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/14/2017 08:09 PM]
127
08/15/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to Consolidate, [126], on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED.[2100654] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/15/2017 09:09 AM]
128
08/15/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100883] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/15/2017 10:54 AM]
129
08/15/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE Motion to Consolidate [128], on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED.[2100908] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/15/2017 11:06 AM]
133
08/22/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Murray, ASSIGNED.[2107158] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:43 AM]
141
08/25/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 08/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2110693] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/25/2017 06:14 PM]
142
08/25/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 08/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2110695] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/25/2017 06:16 PM]
143
08/28/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric F. Citron for Appellants Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989, [142], ADDED.[2110951] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/28/2017 10:18 AM]
144
08/28/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Goldstein for Appellants Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989, [141], ADDED.[2111047] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/28/2017 10:45 AM]
145
08/28/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. Service date 08/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2111305] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:06 PM]
146
08/28/2017
ATTORNEY, Charles Hardy Davis for Appellants Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989, [145], ADDED.[2111772] [17-1989] [Entered: 08/28/2017 03:59 PM]
147
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
148
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
149
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121285] [17-1989] [Entered: 09/11/2017 01:55 PM]
150
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [149], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
151
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [2121293-2], ADDED.[2121763] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/11/2017 04:46 PM]
152
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-1569, Appellee Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in 17-1915, Appellee Citigroup Inc. in 17-2056, Appellee Citigroup, Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2343, Appellee Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2347, Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Funding, Inc. in 17-2360, Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 17-2376, Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. in 17-2381, Appellee Citigroup, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121843] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 06:09 PM]
153
09/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Wiseman for Appellee Citibank, N.A., in case 17-1989, [152], ADDED.[2122634] [17-1989] [Entered: 09/12/2017 03:24 PM]
154
09/14/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2124525] [17-1989] [Entered: 09/14/2017 12:22 PM]
157
09/15/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2125463] [17-1989] [Entered: 09/15/2017 10:41 AM]
168
10/13/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 10/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2147029] [17-1989] [Entered: 10/13/2017 01:05 PM]
171
10/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Neal Kumar Katyal for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1569, [2148434-2], ADDED.[2148702] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/17/2017 08:57 AM]
172
10/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1569 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2413 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2376 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group PLC, in case 17-2343 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2056 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1989 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1915 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2383, [170], ADDED.[2148748] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/17/2017 09:14 AM]
173
10/17/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 10/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2149967] [17-1989] [Entered: 10/17/2017 05:49 PM]
175
11/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169826] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/10/2017 01:00 PM]
176
11/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, 17-1989, FILED. Service date 11/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169829] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/10/2017 01:17 PM]
177
11/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 11/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169836] [17-1989] [Entered: 11/10/2017 02:00 PM]
280
02/08/2018
ATTORNEY, Richard D. Owens for British Bankers' Association BBA Enterprises, Ltd. BBA Libor, Ltd., in case 17-1569, [2231626-2], ADDED.[2231765] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 09:26 AM]
282
02/08/2018
MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2231975] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 11:57 AM]
280
02/08/2018
ATTORNEY, Richard D. Owens for British Bankers' Association BBA Enterprises, Ltd. BBA Libor, Ltd., in case 17-1569, [2231626-2], ADDED.[2231765] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 09:26 AM]
282
02/08/2018
MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2231975] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 11:57 AM]
283
02/08/2018
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to stay & remand [282], on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, Linda Zacher in 17-1915, FILED.[2232058] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 12:32 PM]
284
02/08/2018
MOTION, to stay, to remand appeal, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2232152] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 01:42 PM]
330
03/30/2018
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 03/30/2018 by CM/ECF.[2268656] [17-1989] [Entered: 03/30/2018 12:39 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.