Geoffrey Clark Swisher and Shelley BethAnn Swisher
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

3:2018-bk-00102 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
06/19/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
18
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/06/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
21
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
07/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
23
07/12/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
24
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/16/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.