George L. Alexander
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00294 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/06/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of George l. Alexander
13
10/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
14
10/15/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
12/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
16
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/09/2018
Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
12/10/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
18
12/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
12/14/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.