George Mason University Foundation, Inc. v. Morris, et al. (member)

2:2013-cv-00930 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 482 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/21/2011
COMPLAINT against Sharon Duncan, Thomas W Morris; filing fee paid $350,receipt number 34683015395; filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Civil Cover Sheet
4
Receipt
4 Attachments
2
12/21/2011
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
3
12/21/2011
Summons Issued as to Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris (mailed to counsel), (cmcc,)
4
01/19/2012
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Sharon Duncan served on 1/13/2012, answer due 2/3/2012; Thomas W. Morris served on 1/3/2012, answer due 1/24/2012 (cmcc,)
5
01/23/2012
MOTION to Dismiss (with alternative Motion to Transfer) by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
6
01/23/2012
MOTION to Transfer by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
7
02/06/2012
Opposition to 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
8
02/22/2012
REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Transfer Case, 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibits
1 Attachment
9
03/30/2012
Letter to Hon. James R. Spencer.
10
04/11/2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 4/11/2012. Copies to all parties and counsel of record.(cmcc,)
11
04/11/2012
ORDER denying, for reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, 6 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer, filed by pro se Defendants Thomas W. Morris and Sharon Duncan. Defendants advised of their right to file a written appeal within thirty days. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 4/11/2012. Copies to all parties and counsel of record, (cmcc,)
12
04/20/2012
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (khan,)
13
05/04/2012
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 10 Memorandum Opinion; 11 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case; by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris. Filing fee paid $ 455.
1
Letter
1 Attachment
14
05/04/2012
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 34683016937 re 13 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas W Morris, Sharon Duncan, (cmcc,)
15
05/07/2012
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 13 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, maybe obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (mful,)
16
10/01/2012
Opinion of USCA re 13 Notice of Appeal DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction.(lbre,)
17
10/01/2012
USCA JUDGMENT as to 13 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas W Morris, Sharon Duncan : In accordance with the decision of this court, this appeal is dismissed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (Ibre,)
18
10/15/2012
ORDER of USCA as to 13 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas W Morris, Sharon Duncan : STAY OF MANDATE - This court's mandate is stayed under Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(1), which provides that M[t]he timely filing of a petition for panel rehearing, petition for rehearing en banc, or motion for stay of mandate, stays the mandate until disposition of the petition or motion." (Ibre,)
19
11/21/2012
ORDER of USCA as to 13 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas W. Morris, Sharon Duncan : The court denies the petition for rehearing. (Ibre,)
20
11/29/2012
USCA Mandate re 13 Notice of Appeal: The judgment of this court, entered 10/01/2012, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Ibre,)
21
01/23/2013
NOTICE of Pretrial Conference Notice mailed to both defendants at the address listed on the docket sheet, (khan,)
22
01/23/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Abrams on behalf of George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
23
05/09/2013
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibit A-D
2
Exhibit E-J
2 Attachments
24
05/30/2013
MOTION for Leave to File To Amend Its Complaint by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
25
05/30/2013
Memorandum in Support re 24 MOTION for Leave to File To Amend Its Complaint filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
26
06/11/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Its Complaint, filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibit A-C
2
Exhibit D-G
2 Attachments
27
06/17/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION for Leave to File To Amend Its Complaint filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
28
06/27/2013
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. MAILED TO DEFENDANTS AT ADDRESS ON DOCKET SHEET.(khan,)
29
07/11/2013
Request for Hearing by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. re 24 MOTION for Leave to File To Amend Its Complaint
30
07/18/2013
Discovery Plan by George Mason University Foundation, Inc., Thomas W. Morris.
31
07/24/2013
MOTION of Objection to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint being considered during the Pre-Trial Conference by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Cover Letter
1 Attachment
32
07/24/2013
Rule 26 Disclosure by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Cover Letter
1 Attachment
33
07/24/2013
MOTION for Sanctions by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Attachment
2
Letter
2 Attachments
34
07/25/2013
PRETRIAL ORDER. Mailed copy to both defendants to address that appears on the docket sheet. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 7/25/13. (khan,)
35
08/07/2013
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W.Morris.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Cover Letter
3 Attachments
36
08/07/2013
Memorandum in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Sanctions filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Abrams, Kenneth) (Entered:08/07/2013)
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
6 Attachments
37
08/08/2013
ORDER denying 35 Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by prose dfts Thomas W Morris and Sharon Duncan. The dfts are entitled to appeal the decision of the Court, they must file a notice of appeal with the Clerk of this Court within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 8/8/13.(khan,)
38
08/09/2013
MOTION for Judicial Notice by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W Morris.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
39
08/09/2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James R. Spencer: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2013 re 24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Its Complaint filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. GRANTED. Order to enter. (Court Reporter Jeff Kull, OCR.)(khan,)
40
08/13/2013
ORDER regarding 24 Plaintiff George Mason University Foundation, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend; the Court heard oral argument on August 9, 2013 and for the reasons [listed herein] the Court GRANTS the Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 8/13/2013. Copies to counsel and to Defendants, who appear pro se. (cmcc,)
41
08/19/2013
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris, filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Modified on 8/19/2013 to add party defendants to docket text, (cmcc,)
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
42
08/26/2013
Summons Reissued,for service of Amended Complaint, as to Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris (counsel assistant called to pick up), (cmcc,)
43
08/26/2013
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (with Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue) by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
44
08/26/2013
MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
45
08/30/2013
NOTICE by George Mason University Foundation.
46
09/06/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
47
09/17/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amended Complaint by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Sharon Duncan served on 9/6/2013, answer due 9/27/2013. (cmcc,)
48
09/25/2013
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W Morris. (Note by Clerk: No Exhibits Attached to Pleading.) (cmcc,)
49
09/26/2013
ANSWER to 41 Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Trust Company of Virginia, Karen G Loulakis, COUNTERCLAIM against George Mason University Foundation, Inc. by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2013: #
13
Exhibit M
14
Exhibit N
15
Exhibit O
16
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01712204020" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01712204020','52382','110','','2','1','',''}};">16</a> Exhibit P). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2013: #
17
Exhibit Q
18
Exhibit R
19
Exhibit S
20
Exhibit T
20 Attachments
50
10/02/2013
Summons Issued for Counterclaim (and Third-Party Complaint) as to George Mason University Foundation, Inc.; for Third-Party Complaint (and Counterclaim) as to Karen G. Loulakis, Trust Company of Virginia. (Pro Se Pltf called re: summons to be picked up.)
1
Letter
1 Attachment
51
10/03/2013
MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint and Counts III, VI, VII, VIII, IX, andX of Defendants' Counterclaim by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
52
10/03/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint and Counts III, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and X filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2013: #
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
14 Attachments
53
10/03/2013
Request for Hearing by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint and Counts III, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and X of Defendants' Counterclaim, 52 Memorandum in Support
54
10/08/2013
Opposition to 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
55
10/11/2013
EXHIBITS RECEIVED by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W Morris re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
56
10/16/2013
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Thomas W. Morris, Sharon Duncan for service of counterclaim as to George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (cmcc,)
57
10/16/2013
Summons Reissued for service of counterclaim as to George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (Delivered to courier in Clerk's Office.).
1
Letter
1 Attachment
58
10/17/2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/17/2013. Copies to counsel and defendants, who are pro se.(cmcc,)
59
10/17/2013
ORDER regarding 43 Pro Se Defendants Thomas W. Morris and Sharon Duncan's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer; for reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court DENIES the Defendants' Motions. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/17/2013. Copies to counsel and to defendants, who are pro se.(cmcc,)
60
10/17/2013
RESPONSE to Motion re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris, (cmcc,)
61
10/17/2013
ANSWER to Counterclaim re 49 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (Abrams,Kenneth)
10/17/2013
60 Response treated as a MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc 60 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
10/18/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Karen G. Loulakis served on 10/15/2013, answer due 11/5/2013; Trust Company of Virginia served on 10/11/2013, answer due 11/1/2013 (tjoh,)
63
10/22/2013
MOTION to Withdraw (Motion for Leave to Withdraw the Appearance of Dana Gene Fitzsimons, Jr. by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
64
10/22/2013
Memorandum in Support re 63 MOTION to Withdraw (Motion for Leave toWithdraw the Appearance of Dana Gene Fitzsimons, Jr. filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
65
10/24/2013
ORDER regarding 63 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Dana Gene Fitzsimons, Jr., counsel for George Mason University Foundation, Inc.; the Court GRANTS the Motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to remove Dana Gene Fitzsimons, Jr. as counsel of record. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/24/2013.Copies to counsel, (cmcc,)
66
10/25/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Sullivan Gould on behalf of Trust Company of Virginia
67
10/25/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 49 Answer to Complaint, ThirdParty Complaint, Counterclaim by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
68
10/28/2013
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement/Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Trust Company of Virginia.
69
10/28/2013
Witness List by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
70
10/29/2013
ORDER granting 67 Third-Party Defendant The Trust Company of Virginia's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to defendants' Third-Party Complaint. The Trust Company of Virginia shall file their responsive pleadings on or before November 15,2013. Additionally, the bench trial scheduled for November 12, 2013 is hereby CONTINUED; a later trial date will be set at the motions hearing on November 6, 2013. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/29/2013. Copies to counsel and to defendants, who are pro se. (cmcc,) (Entered:10/29/2013).
71
10/31/2013
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Landis Sexton and Certification of Local Counsel Mary Virginia Andraos Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3729079. by Thomas W. Morris.
72
11/01/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas W. Morris George Mason University Foundation, Inc. served on 10/17/2013, answer due 11/7/2013 (tjoh,)
73
11/04/2013
MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas W. Morris.
74
11/04/2013
Memorandum in Opposition re 71 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Landis Sexton and Certification of Local Counsel Mary Virginia Andraos Filing fee $ 75,receiptnumber0422-3729079. filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
75
11/05/2013
MOTION to Amend/Correct 71 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Landis Sextonand Certification of Local Counsel Mary Virginia Andraos Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3729079. by Thomas W Morris. (Entered:11/05/2013).
76
11/05/2013
Roseboro Notice as to Motion for Summary Judgment by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
77
11/05/2013
Memorandum in Opposition re 73 MOTION to Dismiss filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.
78
11/05/2013
So Ordered re 75 MOTION to Amend/Correct 71 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Landis Sexton and Certification of Local Counsel Mary Virginia Andraos Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3729079. filed by Thomas W. Morris, 71 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Landis Sexton and Certification of Local Counsel Mary Virginia Andraos Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3729079 filed by Thomas W Morris. The Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED.Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/5/13. (khan,) (Entered: 11/05/2013. Modified on 12/23/2013 to correct link.
79
11/05/2013
MOTION for Leave to Appear by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris. (Bowen,Cary)
80
11/05/2013
Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris.
81
11/06/2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James R. Spence: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2013 re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint and Counts III, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and X of Defendants' Counterclaim filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc.,48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas W Morris, Sharon Duncan.Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Jeff Kull, OCR.)(khan,)
82
11/07/2013
PRO SE ANSWER to Counterclaim by Karen G. Loulakis.(tjoh,) by Karen G Loulakis. Modified on 1/24/2014 to add pro se to entry.
83
11/07/2013
PRO SE MOTION for Summary Judgment by Karen G Loulakis. (Entered:11/07/2013) Modified on 1/24/2014 to add pro se to entry.
84
11/07/2013
PRO SE BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Karen G Loulakis. Modified on 1/24/2014 to add pro se to entry.
85
11/13/2013
NOTICE by Trust Company of Virginia of Appearance for Matthew M. Farley (Main Document 85 replaced on 12/20/2013 to reflect the correct document.
86
11/15/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively Motion to Transfer by Trust Company of Virginia.
87
11/15/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
88
11/19/2013
MOTION to Transfer Case by Trust Company of Virginia.
89
11/19/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 88 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
90
11/26/2013
Reply to Motion re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W Morris.
91
12/06/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively Motion to Transfer filed by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W Morris.
92
12/09/2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 12/9/2013. (tjoh,)
93
12/09/2013
ORDER granting 88 Motion to Transfer Case. The Court declines to rule on TCVA'a alternative Motion to Dismiss 86. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER the entire case to the Middle District of Alabama, North Division. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 12/9/2013. (tjoh,) (Entered:12/09/2013).
94
12/09/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively Motion to Transfer filed by Trust Company of Virginia. (Entered: 12/09/2013.
95
12/09/2013
MOTION to Strike 91 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Trust Company of Virginia.
96
12/09/2013
Memorandum in Support re 95 MOTION to Strike 91 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Trust Company of Virginia. (Entered:12/09/2013) filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
97
12/09/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively Motion to Transfer (with exhibits) filed by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
4 Attachments
98
12/18/2013
Case transferred in from the US District Court Eastern District of Virginia Richmond Division; Case Number 3:11cv-00848-JRS. Entire file docket sheet and transfer order sent by email. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2013: # 1 Docket Sheet).
99
12/30/2013
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge., ***Clear MHT_Clerk A Flag.
100
12/30/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce Odom on behalf of Trust Company of Virginia (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2014: # 1 Correct Certificate of Service).
101
12/30/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A Beers on behalf of Trust Company of Virginia (Main Document 101 replaced on 1/2/2014 to reflect correct e-signature). Modified on 1/2/2014.
102
01/02/2014
NOTICE of Correction re 101 Notice of Appearance: The referenced document was filed on 12/30/2013 and did not have the correct e-signature.
1
Correct Notice of Appearance
1 Attachment
103
01/07/2014
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew M. Farley and Andrea S. Gould by Trust Company of Virginia.
104
01/07/2014
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cary B. Bowen and Mary Virginia Andraos, by Sharon Duncan, Thomas W. Morris. Modified on 1/7/2014 to correct docket text.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
105
01/08/2014
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Trust Company of Virginia.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
106
01/13/2014
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 105 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Trust Company of Virginia should not be granted as further set out out. Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/13/2014.
107
01/13/2014
ORDER: Upon consideration of Matthew M. Farley and Andrea S. Gould's motion to withdraw as counsel for the Trust Company of Virginia 103 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/13/2014.
108
01/13/2014
ORDER: Upon consideration of Cary B. Bowen and Mary Virginia Andraos's motion to withdraw as counsel for Thomas W. Morris and Sharon L. Duncan 104 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/13/2014.
01/13/2014
*** Attorney Matthew M. Farley and Andrea Sullivan Gould terminated pursuant to 107 order. (No pdf for this docket entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/13/2014
*** Attorney Mary V. Andraos and Cary Breckinridge Bowen terminated pursuant to 108 order. (No pdf for this docket entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
01/23/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Samuel Brown on behalf of George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2014: # 1 Correct Certificate of Service).
110
01/23/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin Latham (Peck) Fox, Jr on behalf of George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2014: # 1 Correct Certificate of Service).
111
01/23/2014
MOTION for Hearing re 52 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2014: # 1 Correct Certificate of Service).
01/24/2014
Mailed documents #106, #107 and #108 to pro se third party defendant Karen G. Loulakis. (No pdf for this docket entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
01/30/2014
ORDER directing that: (1) The Trust Company of Virginia's motion to consolidate (Docs. # 50 (original action), 105 (transfer action)) is GRANTED; (2) To facilitate the Clerk of the Court's maintenance of the docket, and to prevent the parties' duplicative filing of documents, Thomas Morris v. Trust Company of Virginia (Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-1020-WKW) is DESIGNATED as the lead case, and George Mason University Foundation, Inc. v. Thomas Morris, et al. (Civil Action No. 2:13-cv-930-WKW) is DESIGNATED as the member case; (3) All future motions, pleadings, notices, and other filings by the parties must be filed in the lead case; (4) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file this order in both the lead case and the member case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/30/14.
01/30/2014
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
02/26/2014
ORDER directing that the motion for hearing (Doc. # 53, lead case), the motion for oral argument (Doc. # 111, member case), and motion for status conference (Doc. # 60, lead case) are DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/26/14.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
114
11/25/2014
[STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD, FILED IN ERROR IN MEMBER CASE. PLEASE DISREGARD THIS DOCKET ENTRY.] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by George Mason University Foundation, Inc. Modified on 11/26/2014 to reflect actual title.
115
12/01/2014
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 114 Supplemental Brief. The referenced document was filed in the MEMBER CASE in error pursuant to the consolidation order (Doc. #112]. Therefore, Doc. 114 is STRICKEN from the MEMBER case and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry of this pleading on the court's docket.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.