George W. Huling
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00341 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
101
06/06/2018
Approving Modification of Plan (BKPLAN05) (SA)
102
07/10/2018
Report of Unclaimed Funds / Funds Less than 5 dollars
103
07/11/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
104
08/01/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
105
08/08/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
106
09/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
107
09/18/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.