Gesrin Kling
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01426 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
08/09/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
02/12/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
48
02/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.