Gigi M Love
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00280 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/28/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
08/28/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
08/28/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
08/28/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/29/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
9
08/29/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
08/29/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
11
08/29/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
12
08/29/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
13
08/30/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
08/31/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/31/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
15
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
16
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
17
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
18
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
20
10/15/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
21
10/23/2018
Entry of Appearance
22
10/23/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
10/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
25
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
27
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
28
01/23/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
29
01/24/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
30
01/31/2019
Proceeding Memo
31
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
32
02/08/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
33
02/08/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
34
02/27/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
02/27/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
03/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
36
03/06/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
03/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
03/13/2019
Proceeding Memo
38
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.