Gilmore et al v. Lander Properties, LLC et al

2:2012-cv-01076 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 482 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/11/2012
COMPLAINT against Peter Audie, Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Eatz, Inc., Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602025236.), filed by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton.
1
fee receipt
1 Attachment
2
12/11/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joyce Gilmore.
3
12/11/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Thornton.
4
12/12/2012
Summons Issued as to Peter Audie, Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Eatz, Inc., Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service on defendants.
5
12/27/2012
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Gilmore. All Defendants.
6
01/02/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc.
7
01/02/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc.
01/02/2013
***Attorney Marion Jefferson Starling, III for Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC,Marion Jefferson Starling, III for Bama Lanes, Inc.,Marion Jefferson Starling, III for Steve T. Lander,Marion Jefferson Starling, III for Lander Properties, LLC,Marion Jefferson Starling, III for The Blue Iguana, Inc. added pursuant to 7 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/16/2013
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time as requested. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/16/13.
9
01/18/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Peter Audie, Eatz, Inc.
01/18/2013
***Attorney W. Stanley Gregory for Peter Audie,W. Stanley Gregory for Eatz, Inc. added pursuant to 9 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
01/22/2013
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/22/13.
11
02/04/2013
Joint MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline by Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Joyce Gilmore, Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc., Christopher Thornton.
02/04/2013
Motion to stay treated as a MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Joyce Gilmore, Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc. pursuant to 14 order (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry 11). (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
02/05/2013
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Peter Audie: Corporate Disclosures due by 2/15/2013.
1
standing order & format
1 Attachment
13
02/05/2013
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Eatz, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/15/2013.
1
standing order & format
1 Attachment
14
02/06/2013
ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 11 Motion to Stay answer deadline is treated as a motion for extension; (2) the 11 Motion for Extension of Time is granted to the extent that the answer deadline is extended to 3/4/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/6/13.
15
02/07/2013
ORDER setting Mediation Conference for 2/25/2013 @ 09:00 AM before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer, in Courtroom 4A FMJ USCC, Montgomery, AL, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/7/13. Furnished to calendar group & CB.
16
02/15/2013
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Peter Audie, Eatz, Inc., Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton.
17
02/19/2013
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal 16, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that defendants Peter Audie and Eatz, Inc. and the claims against them are dismissed with prejudice, with theparties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Defendants Audie and Eatz, Inc. are terminated as parties. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/19/2013.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
18
02/27/2013
(VACATED PURSUANT TO 20 ORDER) JUDGMENT, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/27/13. Modified on 4/19/2013.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
19
04/16/2013
Joint MOTION to Set Aside 18 Judgment, Dismissal and Stipulation to Dismissal by Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Joyce Gilmore, Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc., Christopher Thornton. Additional MOTIONS to Reinstate Case and MOTION to Stay on 4/17/2013 modified to clarify docket to reflect two additional motions contained in this document (qc/djy,).
04/16/2013
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bama Lanes Prattville, LLC, Bama Lanes, Inc., Joyce Gilmore, Steve T. Lander, Lander Properties, LLC, The Blue Iguana, Inc., Christopher Thornton. (This document has no pdf attached, see Doc. 19 for pdf.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
04/19/2013
ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 19 MOTION to Set Aside is GRANTED; (2) the 18 Judgment is vacated and this case is reinstated; (3) the proceedings in this case are stayed; (4) this case is closed administratively pending the stay. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/19/13.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
21
12/02/2013
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 19 Stipulation of Dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs, expenses, and fees. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. This case remains closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/2/2013.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.