Gilmore et al v. Montgomery Bar-b-q, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:2013-cv-00172 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/20/2013
COMPLAINT against Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602026483), filed by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton.
1
Filing Fee Receipt
1 Attachment
2
03/20/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Thornton.
3
03/20/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joyce Gilmore.
4
03/22/2013
Summons Issued as to Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C. and returned to counsel for service by process server.
5
04/01/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Gilmore. Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc. served on 3/27/2013, answer due 4/17/2013.
6
04/01/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Gilmore. WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C. served on 3/27/2013, answer due 4/17/2013.
7
04/12/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C.
8
04/15/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Tae Phillips on behalf of Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C.
9
04/15/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc.
10
04/15/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C.
11
04/16/2013
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due from Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc. on 5/6/2013; WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C. on 5/6/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/16/2013.
12
05/03/2013
MOTION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline by Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C.
13
05/06/2013
ORDER that Defendants' 12 Consent MOTION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline is GRANTED, allowing a response to the Complaint to be filed on or before 6/5/2013. Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc. answer due 6/5/2013; WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C. answer due 6/5/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/6/2013.
14
06/05/2013
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C.
15
06/06/2013
RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/6/2013.
16
07/08/2013
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
17
07/08/2013
AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. [Modified on 7/9/2013 to reflect this is an "Amended" report.-dmn]
18
07/09/2013
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2014 in Chambers, A-300, in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller. Non-Jury Trial set for 3/10/2014 in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller. Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2013. Discovery due by 12/2/2013. Motions due by 10/7/2013. Mediation Notice due by 11/2/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/9/2013. Copies furnished to calendar group, WR.
19
07/23/2013
Objection to re 18 Scheduling Order, filed by Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C.
20
07/24/2013
ORDER directing that the plaintiffs show cause in writing on or before July 30, 2013 as to why the 19 objection should not be sustained. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/24/13.
21
07/30/2013
RESPONSE to Defendants' 19 Objection to Scheduling Order and Response to 20 Order to Show Cause filed by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton. [Modified on 7/31/2013 to reflect actual title and to create link to Doc. 19. Wrong event code used when originally filed.-dmn]
07/30/2013
RESPONSE TO 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton. (This document has no pdf attached, see Doc. 21 for pdf.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/05/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lister Hubbard, Jr on behalf of All Defendants
23
08/05/2013
ORDER re Defendants' 19 Objection to the Court's 18 Uniform Scheduling Order. It is ORDERED that the dispositive motion deadline is continued from 10/7/2013 to 11/8/2013. It is the Court's policy to set the dispositive motion deadline 90 days or more prior to the pretrial hearing, which in this case is set for 2/6/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/5/2013.
24
08/23/2013
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C.
1
Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order
1 Attachment
25
08/26/2013
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion for Entry of a Protective Order as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/26/2013.
26
09/04/2013
ORDER that this matter be set for a Mediation Conference on 9/18/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer. On or before Friday, 9/13/2013, by close of business each party shall deliver directly to the undersigned Judge a confidential mediation statement which is intended solely for the Courts use in preparing for the mediation conference as further set out in the order. This confidential mediation statement should not be filed with or transmitted via facsimile to the Clerk of Court nor served upon the other parties. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/4/2013. Copies furnished to calendar group, CB.
27
09/16/2013
ORDER RESETTING Mediation Conference set for 9/18/2013 to 10/4/2013 @ 09:00 AM before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer, in Courtroom 4A FMJ USCC, Montgomery, AL, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/16/13. Furnished to calendar group & CB.
10/04/2013
Minute Entry for Mediation Conference held before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/4/2013 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 8:00-5:00.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
10/10/2013
Joint MOTION to Stay by Montgomery Bar-B-Q, Inc., WM Larry Powell Co. L.L.C., Joyce Gilmore, and Christopher Thornton. Modified on 10/11/2013 to add additional filers.
29
10/18/2013
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 28 Joint MOTION to Stay; the motion is GRANTED to the extent that all pending deadlines are stayed until 11/15/2013; the parties shall provide a written update advising the Court of the status of this matter no later than 11/15/2013; the dispositive Motion deadline in this case is extended to 11/22/2013; the motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/18/13.
30
10/18/2013
NOTICE of Change of Address by Lowell Landis Sexton (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2013: # 1 corrected certificate of service).
31
11/15/2013
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton.
32
11/18/2013
FINAL JUDGMENT directing that, pursuant to the Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 31), it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that this case is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and expenses; the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/18/13.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist) (Furnished to Calendar/WR) (Term'd Final PTC <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="02/06/2020" time="">02/06/20</a>4 and Non-Jury trial 03/10/2014
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.