Gilmore v. Captain D's, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

2:2013-cv-00182 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/25/2013
COMPLAINT against Captain D's, LLC (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602026523), filed by Joyce Gilmore.
1
Filing Fee Receipt
1 Attachment
2
03/25/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joyce Gilmore.
03/28/2013
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Joyce Gilmore. (NO PDF) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
03/28/2013
Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Captain D's, LLC.
4
04/02/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Gilmore. Captain D's, LLC served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013.
5
04/18/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Christine Green on behalf of Captain D's, LLC
6
04/18/2013
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Captain D's, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
04/18/2013
***Attorney Charles Kevin Grant added Pro Hac Vice for Captain D's, LLC. (see Doc. 6 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/19/2013
Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Captain D's, LLC.
8
04/19/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Captain D's, LLC.
04/19/2013
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Captain D's, LLC. (NO PDF attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/19/2013
PRO HAC VICE Filing fee received re 6 Motion for Charles Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602026850. [Modified on 4/23/2013 to reflect correct attorney name.-dmn]
10
04/23/2013
ORDER that the 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice be and is hereby GRANTED and Attorney Charles K. Grant be and is hereby ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent defendant Captain D's, LLC, in this action. Counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the court. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/23/2013.
11
05/17/2013
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
12
05/22/2013
RULE 26(F) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/22/2013.
13
05/31/2013
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
14
06/21/2013
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2014 before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Non-Jury Trial set for 4/28/2014 before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Amended Pleadings due by plaintiff on or before 8/2/2013 and by the defendant on or before 9/3/2013. Discovery due by 12/2/2013. Motions due by 12/21/2013. Mediation Notice due by 1/6/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/21/2013. Copies furnished to calendar group, AG.
15
09/16/2013
(STRICKEN pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Joyce Gilmore by Joyce Gilmore. Modified on 9/17/2013 (qc/djy,).
16
09/17/2013
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 15 Response to Discovery which is hereby STRICKEN pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery
1
local rule 26.3
1 Attachment
17
09/25/2013
MOTION for Extension of Deadline (Expert Disclosures) by Joyce Gilmore.
18
09/27/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Extension of Deadline (Expert Disclosures) filed by Captain D's, LLC.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
16 Attachments
19
09/30/2013
REPLY to Defendant's 18 OPPOSITION to 17 MOTION for Extension of Deadline (Expert Disclosures) filed by Joyce Gilmore. Modified on 10/1/2013 to clarify text as in reply to 18 opposition as reflected in PDF document (qc/djy,).
20
10/01/2013
ORDER directing that the 17 MOTION for Extension of Deadline Expert Disclosures be set for argument on 10/9/2013 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody, by telephone conference call; the conference call shall be set up by the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/1/13. Furnished to calendar group & WS.
21
10/09/2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Motion Hearing by telephone held on 10/9/2013 re 17 MOTION for Extension of Deadline (Expert Disclosures) filed by Joyce Gilmore (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time FTR: 10:04 - 10:07.)
22
10/09/2013
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of the deadline for expert disclosures, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/9/13.
23
10/18/2013
NOTICE of Change of Address by Lowell Landis Sexton (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2013: # 1 corrected certificate of service).
24
10/30/2013
Witness List by Joyce Gilmore.
25
11/12/2013
MOTION for Extension of Deadline Objection to Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure by Captain D's, LLC.
26
11/14/2013
ORDER granting 25 Motion for leave to Extend Deadline to object to plaintiff's expert disclosure. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/14/13.
27
11/15/2013
Joint MOTION to Stay or Continue by Captain D's, LLC.
28
11/19/2013
ORDER denying 27 Motion to Stay or continue, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/19/13.
29
12/06/2013
JUDGMENT, the court having been informed that this cause is now settled, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/6/13.
1
civil appeals checklist). Furnished to calendar group & AG (terminates Final Pretrial Conference 03/21/2014 and Non-Jury Trial 04/28/2014
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.