Gilmore v. Jrn, Inc. (joint Assign)(mag+)
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2014-cv-00690 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 688 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/18/2014
COMPLAINT against JRN, Inc., filed by Joyce Gilmore.
2
07/18/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joyce Gilmore.
3
07/22/2014
Filing fee re 1 Complaint: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602032771
4
07/23/2014
Summons Issued as to JRN, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with 1 Complaint.
5
07/25/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of 4 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by L. Payne for JRN, Inc. served on 7/24/2014, answer due 8/14/2014.
6
08/14/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by JRN, Inc.
7
08/14/2014
MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement or, Alternatively, to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by JRN, Inc.
8
08/15/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Christine Green on behalf of JRN, Inc.
9
08/15/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by JRN, Inc.
10
08/21/2014
Case REASSIGNED to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller no longer assigned to the case.
11
09/04/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JRN, Inc., filed by Joyce Gilmore.
12
09/04/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 7 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement or, Alternatively, to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Joyce Gilmore.
13
09/17/2014
Second MOTION for More Definite Statement or, Alternatively, to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by JRN, Inc.
09/17/2014
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, by JRN, Inc. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 13 Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/21/2014
ORDER directing that, in light of the filing of the amended complaint (doc no. 11), it is ORDERED that the first motion for more definite statement or to dismiss for lack of standing (doc. no. 7) is denied as moot; further ORDERED that the second motion for more definite statement or to dismiss for lack of standing (doc. no. 13) is set for submission, without oral argument, on December 19, 2014, with any opposition brief due by December 12, 2014, and any reply to the opposition due by December 19, 2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/14.
11/25/2014
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (NO PDF attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/25/2014
ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Paul Greene, United States Magistrate Judge, for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/25/2014.
16
12/04/2014
MOTION to Withdraw Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Paragraph 15 by Joyce Gilmore.
17
12/22/2014
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
18
01/26/2015
MOTION for Order to Set Scheduling Order by Joyce Gilmore.
19
01/27/2015
ORDER directing as follows: (1) Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Paragraph 15 of the Amended Complaint (Doc. 16) is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint that omits Paragraph 15 of the Amended Complaint by February 3, 2015; (3) Defendant shall file an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint by February 10, 2015; (4) "Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement or, Alternatively, to Dismiss for Lack of Standing" (Doc. 13) is DENIED AS MOOT; and (5) Plaintiff's Motion for a Scheduling Order (Doc. 18) is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 1/27/15.
20
01/27/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER setting: Amended Pleadings due from plaintiff by 02/05/2015 and from defendant by 03/05/2015; Discovery due by 05/19/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 06/09/2015; Mediation Notice due by 06/03/2015; as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 1/27/15.
21
02/02/2015
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against JRN, Inc., filed by Joyce Gilmore.
22
02/10/2015
ANSWER to 21 Amended Complaint Defendant's Answer to Second Amended Complaint by JRN, Inc.
23
04/21/2015
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Joyce Gilmore.
24
04/21/2015
JUDGMENT, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the plf's 23 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED, with leave to the def to file, within 14 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the case reinstated should the def object to the dismissal; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/21/15.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.