Gilmore v. Rdic, Llc, et al. (joint Assign)(mag2)
Court Docket Sheet

2:2014-cv-00689 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/18/2014
COMPLAINT against RDIC, LLC and Russell Lands, Inc., filed by Joyce Gilmore.
2
07/18/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joyce Gilmore.
3
07/22/2014
Filing fee re 1 Complaint: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602032843
4
07/24/2014
Summons Issued as to RDIC, LLC and Russell Lands, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with 1 Complaint.
5
08/21/2014
Case REASSIGNED to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller no longer assigned to the case.
6
09/03/2014
MOTION to Dismiss, Or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay, and Motion to Disqualify Counsel, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by RDIC, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
09/03/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by RDIC, LLC. (No PDF attached to this entry; see 6 Motion to Dismiss) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/03/2014
MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Sanctions, and MOTION to Disqualify, by RDIC, LLC. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 6 Motion to Dismiss.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/04/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Steele Nabors on behalf of RDIC, LLC
8
09/24/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joyce Gilmore.
9
09/24/2014
OPPOSITION to 6 MOTION to Stay filed by Joyce Gilmore. Modified on 9/25/2014 to reflect actual title.
10
09/29/2014
MOTION for Sanctions by Joyce Gilmore.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
7 Attachments
09/29/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss, Or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay, and Motion to Disqualify Counsel, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Joyce Gilmore. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 10 Motion for sanctions.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
10/06/2014
ORDER directing that the motion to dismiss (doc. no. 6), motion to stay (doc. no. 6), motion to disqualify (doc. no. 6), and motion for sanctions (doc. no. 10) are set for submission, without oral argument, on October 24, 2014, with any opposition briefs due by October 17, 2014, and any replies to the opposition due by October 24, 2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/6/14.
12
10/17/2014
Response to Motion re 10 MOTION for Sanctions filed by RDIC, LLC. Modified on 10/17/2014 to correct docket text pursuant to PDF document.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
10/17/2014
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 12 Reply to Response to Motion to reflect having changed text to "Response to Motion re 10 Motion" pursuant to PDF document. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/17/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss, Or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay, and Motion to Disqualify Counsel, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Joyce Gilmore.
14
10/23/2014
RESPONSE in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss, Or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay, and Motion to Disqualify Counsel, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by RDIC, LLC.
15
10/24/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Joyce Gilmore.
1
Exhibit E
2
Exhibit F
3
Exhibit G
3 Attachments
11/25/2014
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/25/2014
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Paul W. Greene for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/25/2014.
17
12/23/2014
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
18
01/26/2015
MOTION for Order to Set Scheduling Order by Joyce Gilmore.
19
02/27/2015
ORDER as follows: (1) This action is STAYED pending the resolution of Defendants' motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel (Doc. 6) and Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Doc. 10), and the parties are DIRECTED to cease all activities associated with this case except as ordered by the court on the matters of disqualification of counsel and sanctions; (2) Defendants' motion to stay for the purpose of allowing a reasonable time to ensure compliance with the Americans with Disabilities Act (Doc. 6) is DENIED; (3) The court DEFERS ruling or entering a recommendation on Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 6); and, (4) Plaintiff's motion for entry of a scheduling order (Doc. 18) is DENIED; further ORDERED that Defendants' motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel (Doc. 6) and Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Doc. 10) are set for a hearing before the undersigned Magistrate Judge at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, March 11, 2015 in Courtroom 4-E in the United States Courthouse, 1 Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; all counsel of record shall attend; the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to provide a court reporter for the hearing and to mail a copy of this order to the Office of General Counsel for the Alabama State Bar Association, 415 Dexter Avenue, Montgomery, Alabama 36104. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on February 27, 2015. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(Furnished to USDC Clerk of Court)(Mailed CMRRR to General Counsel for the Alabama State Bar Association)
20
02/27/2015
MOTION to Reset Hearing Time for Hearing on March 11, 2015, by RDIC, LLC. Modified on 2/27/2015 to clarify text pursuant to PDF document.
21
03/02/2015
ORDER directing that the 20 Motion to Reset Hearing Time is GRANTED; the hearing previously set for 10:00 AM on Wednesday, March 11, 2015 is RESET for 1:00 PM on Wednesday, March 11, 2015 in Courtroom 4-E in the United States Courthouse, 1 Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on March 2, 2015. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(Furnished to Clerk of Court)
22
03/03/2015
Return receipt card indicating delivery of 19 Order; signed by (ILLEGIBLE) for Alabama State Bar Association Office of General Counsel on 03/02/2015.
23
03/11/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2015 re 10 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Joyce Gilmore, 6 MOTION to Dismiss, Or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay, and Motion to Disqualify Counsel, With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by RDIC, LLC (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Risa Entrekin.)
24
03/11/2015
ORDER directing as follows: (1) the stay of this case imposed on February 27, 2015 (Doc. 19) is LIFTED; and (2) Plaintiff and Defendants are each granted leave to file, if they so choose, a supplemental brief on Defendant RDIC, LLC's motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel (Doc. 6) and Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Doc. 10) by 12:00 PM on Wednesday, March 18, 2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 03/11/2015.
25
03/18/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support (Supplemental) of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel filed by RDIC, LLC.
26
03/18/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION for Sanctions Supplemental filed by Joyce Gilmore.
27
03/23/2015
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Disqualify Plf's Counsel; ORDER denying 10 Motion for Sanctions, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 3/23/2015.
28
03/23/2015
ORDER denying as moot 6 MOTION to Dismiss; and consistent with Rule 12, FRCP, RDIC shall file an Answer or response to the First Amended Complaint by 4/1/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 3/23/2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
03/23/2015
***Attorney Thomas Andrew Davis for Russell Lands, Inc. added pursuant to the Court's 29 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
03/23/2015
ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 3/30/2015 why Dft Russell Lands, Inc. should not be dismissed as a party to this action pursuant to Rule 4(m). Plf is relieved of her obligation to show cause if she files a notice and evidence of record demonstrating that Dft Russell Lands, Inc. has been served or waived service; Also, at the 3/11/2015, hearing, attorney Thomas Andrew Davis stated on the record that he represents Russell Lands, Inc. in this matter; DIRECTING the Clerk to amend the record to reflect that Mr. Davis entered an appearance on behalf of Russell Lands, Inc. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 3/23/2015.
30
03/23/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER, as further set out in order; Mediation Notice due by 5/20/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 3/23/2015.
31
03/26/2015
MOTION to Dismiss Russell Lands, Inc. Without Prejudice by Joyce Gilmore.
32
04/01/2015
ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by RDIC, LLC.
33
04/01/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to RDIC, LLC and Russell Lands, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 4/13/2015.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
34
04/01/2015
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on March 11, 2015, before Judge Paul W. Greene. Court Reporter/Transcriber Risa L. Entrekin, Telephone number 334-240-2405. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 4/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2015.
35
04/07/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by RDIC, LLC re 33 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to RDIC, LLC and Russell Lands, Inc. Modified on 4/7/2015 to create relationship to 33 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to RDIC, LLC and Russell Lands, Inc.
36
04/14/2015
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Russell Lands, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 4/24/2015.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
37
04/21/2015
JUDGMENT directing that: (1) The motion to dismiss (doc. no. 31) is granted, as further set out; (2) Defendant Russell Lands, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice and terminated as a party, with costs taxed as paid, as further set out; the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; this case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on April 21, 2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
04/21/2015
*** Attorney Thomas Andrew Davis terminated as counsel for Defendant Russell Lands, Inc. pursuant to 37 Judgment. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
05/04/2015
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.3 RE NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE by RDIC, LLC of Compliance with Scheduling Order (Main Document 38 replaced on 5/4/2015). Modified on 5/4/2015.
39
05/04/2015
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 38 Notice to reflect striking pursuant to local rule re non-filing of civil discovery.
1
Local rule re Discovery
1 Attachment
40
05/11/2015
Response to Order re 30 Scheduling Order NOTICE OF JUSTICIABLE CONTROVERSIES by Joyce Gilmore.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
41
05/15/2015
MOTION for Rhonda Steele Nabors to Withdraw as Attorney by RDIC, LLC.
42
05/15/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Attorney Rhonda Steele Nabors terminated as counsel of record. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on May 15, 2015.
43
05/20/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation by Joyce Gilmore.
44
05/20/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on May 20, 2015. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
45
05/27/2015
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation (unopposed) by Joyce Gilmore.
46
05/27/2015
ORDER directing as follows: (1) Plaintiff's "Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time" (Doc. 45) is DENIED; and (2) Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice with the court, by June 3, 2015, fulfilling the last requirement of the March 23, 2015 Scheduling Order, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on May 27, 2015.
47
06/03/2015
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by Joyce Gilmore
48
07/16/2015
ORDER setting Mediation Conference set for 7/27/2015 @ 01:00 PM before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer, in Courtroom 4A FMJ USCC, Montgomery, AL; directing that on or before 7/23/2015 by close of business each party shall deliver to the undersigned judge a confidential mediation statement which is intended solely for the Court's use in preparing for the mediation conference; the statement should not be filed with or transmitted to the Clerk nor served on the parties, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/16/15. Furnished to calendar group & CB.
07/27/2015
Minute Entry for Mediation Conference held before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/27/2015 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 1:00-5:00.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
09/24/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER setting a short, closely monitored period of discovery, as further set out in order; Mediation Notice due by 11/9/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2015; Discovery due by 10/30/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 9/24/2015.
50
11/23/2015
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joyce Gilmore.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
11/23/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joyce Gilmore. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry 50). (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
11/30/2015
SECOND Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by Joyce Gilmore Modified on 12/1/2015 to clarify text to reflect as SECOND Notice (qc/djy,).
52
12/04/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by RDIC, LLC.
53
12/08/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in opposition to plf's 50 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 12/8/15. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).
54
12/23/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Response to Summary Judgment by Joyce Gilmore.
55
12/28/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time; plf's reply brief is due on or before 1/22/2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 12/28/15. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).
56
12/30/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RDIC, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
57
12/30/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED) filed by RDIC, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
58
01/22/2016
REPLY BRIEF re 57 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Joyce Gilmore.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
59
02/03/2016
MOTION for Order To Set Scheduling Order by Joyce Gilmore.
60
02/05/2016
ORDER denying 59 Motion for Scheduling Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 2/5/16.
61
04/01/2016
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that plf's 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment is due to be DENIED; Objections to R&R due by 4/15/2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 4/1/16.
04/29/2016
No objections filed to 61 report and recommendation (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
05/03/2016
OPINION and ORDER, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) the 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (2) plf's 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment is denied; (3) this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/3/16.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
63
05/16/2016
SCHEDULING ORDER directing as follows: Lists of trial witnesses, exhibits, and objections under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) must be served and filed by 10/13/2016, and objections are to be filled within 7 days after receipt of final lists of witnesses and exhibits; The final pretrial hearing and trial date will be set by a separate order of the District Judge; however, the parties should be prepared for a final pretrial hearing by 11/1/2016, and for trial during the trial term of the presiding District Judgebeginning on 11/28/16. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 5/16/16.
64
08/04/2016
SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2016 @ 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Non-Jury Trial set for 11/28/2016 @ 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/4/16. Furnished to calendar group & AG.
65
08/08/2016
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
66
10/07/2016
TEXT ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 10/11/2016 @ 08:30 AM before Honorable Judge Abdul K. Kallon; the parties are directed to call 1-888-557-8511, access code 4541204, five minutes prior to the start of the conference. Signed by Honorable Judge Abdul K. Kallon on 10/7/16. Furnished to calendar group, AG & WR. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).
10/11/2016
Minute Entry for telephonic status conference proceedings (no court reporter) held before Honorable Judge Abdul K. Kallon: Status Conference held on 10/11/2016 (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
10/19/2016
ORDER: The parties having informed the court that they have amicably settled this case, the court CANCELS the pretrial conference and trial scheduled for October 21, 2016 and November 28, 2016, respectively. The court will keep this case open for now and, unless the parties affirmatively request otherwise, will dismiss this case with prejudice on November 21, 2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Abdul K. Kallon on 10/19/2016. (furn: calendar, AG)
68
11/23/2016
ORDER, Consistent with the 67 Order entered on 10/19/16, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Honorable Judge Abdul K. Kallon on 11/22/16.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.