Gilmore v. Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc. et al (mag2)
Court Docket Sheet

2:2015-cv-00788 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/27/2015
COMPLAINT against Etheredge Family Trust, MJBJ Real Estate, LLC, Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602038826.), filed by Joyce Gilmore.
1
Receipt
1 Attachment
2
10/27/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joyce Gilmore.
10/29/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Joyce Gilmore. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/29/2015
Summons Issued as to Etheredge Family Trust, MJBJ Real Estate, LLC, Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of Complaint.
4
11/04/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Jamie Etheredge for Etheredge Family Trust served on 11/2/2015, answer due 11/23/2015.
5
11/17/2015
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to MJBJ Real Estate, LLC.
6
11/17/2015
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc.
7
11/18/2015
Alias Summons issued as to MJBJ Real Estate, LLC, Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 Complaint.
8
11/30/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of 7 Alias Summons and 1 Complaint signed by Faye Martin for Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc. served on 11/23/2015, answer due 12/14/2015.
9
12/11/2015
Alias Summons Returned Unexecuted as to MJBJ Real Estate, LLC.; counsel is notified of unperfected service via this notice.
10
12/11/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Alan Sides on behalf of All Defendants
11
12/11/2015
Defendants ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Etheredge Family Trust, MJBJ Real Estate, LLC, Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc.
12
12/14/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Etheredge Family Trust.
12/14/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Etheredge Family Trust, MJBJ Real Estate, LLC, Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/14/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by MJBJ Real Estate, LLC.
14
12/14/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc.
15
12/16/2015
RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/5/2016; the parties were notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and the right to consent or request reassignment, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 1/5/2016; DO NOT FILE THE FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/16/2015.
16
12/28/2015
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
17
12/29/2015
AMENDED Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by MJBJ Real Estate, LLC re 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. Modified on 12/29/2015 to clarify the docket text.
18
12/29/2015
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/29/2015.
19
01/04/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
20
01/07/2016
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2017, in Montgomery, AL, before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; Non-Jury Trial set for 2/27/2017, in Montgomery, AL, before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; Dispositive and Dabuert Motions due by 7/14/2016; Mediation Notice due by 8/11/2016; Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2016; Discovery due by 6/10/2016, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/7/2016. (furn: calendar, ar)
21
04/01/2016
MOTION for Extension of Deadline Expert Disclosures by Joyce Gilmore.
22
04/04/2016
ORDERED that this 21 motion is set for a hearing by telephone on April 6, 2016 at 3:00 PM Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED to initiate the call. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/4/2016. (furn: Calendar, JT)
23
04/06/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Motion Hearing (Telephone) held on 4/6/2016 re 21 MOTION for Extension of Deadline Expert Disclosures filed by Joyce Gilmore (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 3:00 - 3:07.) Modified on 4/6/2016 to add docket text.
24
04/06/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of the Expert Disclosure Deadline. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/6/2016.(no pdf document attached to this entry)
25
05/26/2016
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Etheredge Family Trust, MJBJ Real Estate, LLC, Wendy's of Bowling Green, Inc., Joyce Gilmore. Modified on 5/26/2016 as filed on behalf of the plaintiff.
26
05/31/2016
ORDER re 25 parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action has been dismissed with prejudice by operation of Rule 41, on the terms agreed to and set out by the parties. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/31/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.