Giron et al v. Springboard Incorporated et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2017-cv-04280 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
05/31/2018
Extension of Time to Amend
26
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
27
06/13/2018
Amended Complaint
28
06/13/2018
Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))
29
06/18/2018
Extension of Time
30
06/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
31
07/04/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
07/05/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
07/16/2018
Statement
07/16/2018
1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Discovery Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
07/20/2018
Notice (Other)
37
07/20/2018
Notice (Other)
38
07/23/2018
Notice of Service of Discovery
39
07/27/2018
Response
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Discovery Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
07/27/2018
Notice (Other)
43
08/24/2018
Notice of Service of Discovery
44
08/24/2018
Notice of Service of Discovery
45
10/15/2018
Notice of Service of Discovery
46
10/15/2018
Notice of Service of Discovery
10/16/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Discovery Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.