Glenn Allen McMurtry and Karista Danielle McMurtry
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81336 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/26/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/26/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
28
07/18/2018
Meeting of Creditors Continued
33
07/30/2018
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
38
08/05/2018
Schedule J
39
08/05/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
40
08/05/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
41
08/05/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
42
08/05/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
65
09/18/2018
Relief from Stay
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.