Glenn E Lockwood and Saray C Lockwood
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00102 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/02/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event)
2
04/02/2019
Ch 11 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122B)
3
04/02/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
04/02/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
04/02/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
04/02/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/03/2019
Entry of Appearance
04/03/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/04/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
04/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
04/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
04/09/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
13
04/10/2019
Entry of Appearance
14
04/15/2019
Employ (CM41)
15
04/15/2019
Declaration
04/30/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
05/01/2019
Entry of Appearance
05/02/2019
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.