Glenn Joseph Martin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00337 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/05/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/05/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
10/05/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
10/12/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
10/12/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
10/12/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12
10/12/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
13
10/15/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
14
10/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.