Gordon A Needham
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81712 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
11
06/12/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
12
06/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
17
07/27/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
43
01/04/2019
Limit Notice
45
01/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.