Gordon David Kerr and Tara Ashley Kerr
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00435 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/26/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
12/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
12/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12/26/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/26/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12/26/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
12/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
12/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
12/27/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
12/27/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
03/15/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
16
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
03/29/2019
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
19
04/01/2019
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
20
04/02/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
04/02/2019
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
04/02/2019
Extend Entry of Discharge
22
04/02/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
23
04/02/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
04/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
04/17/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
26
04/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
04/29/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.