Gordon Leon Allington and Lisa Marie Tilgner-Allington
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00221 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
07/16/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
07/16/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/16/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
07/17/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
16
08/01/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
08/01/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
18
08/09/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
19
08/09/2018
Certificate of Service
08/09/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
09/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
09/26/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
26
09/26/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
27
09/26/2018
Notice of Modified Ch 13 Plan With Objection Deadline
28
09/26/2018
Certificate of Service
29
10/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
10/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
10/31/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
31
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
32
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
33
11/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
34
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
35
11/28/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
36
12/10/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
37
12/11/2018
Notice of Modified Ch 13 Plan With Objection Deadline
38
12/11/2018
Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.